Sims v. Boyde et al
Plaintiff: Harold Shawgnessy Sims
Defendant: Marty Boyde, Herald Perrin, Black, Does Craighead County Sheriff Staff; Craighead County Detention Center OIC and Nurse on duty, Keith Bowers, Sterling, Selina and Stacy Dickerson
Case Number: 4:2018cv00638
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Joe J Volpe
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 16 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (cmn)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #14 Order, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/31/2018. (cmn)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER approving and adopting #12 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice this case; counting dismissal as a strike; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order adopting the recommendation and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/31/2018. (cmn)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendations by Harold Shawgnessy Sims. (kdr)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be dismissed without prejudice. Dismissal be counted as a strike, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/15/2018. (lej)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #9 . Service is not appropriate at this time. Plaintiff's motion for clarification is denied as moot #8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/15/2018. (lej)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Harold Shawgnessy Sims. (cel)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harold Shawgnessy Sims. (cel)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Clarification by Harold Shawgnessy Sims. (cel)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #3 . Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either: (a) pay the full $400 filing fee; or (b) file a properly completed Application and Calculation Sheet. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient, and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/25/2018. (lej)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE filed by Harold Shawgnessy Sims. (ljb)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE filed by Harold Shawgnessy Sims. (ljb)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to the Court by Harold Shawgnessy Sims. (ljb)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harold Shawgnessy Sims. (ljb)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff must submit, within 30 days of the date of this order, either (a) pay the full $400 filing fee; or (b) file a properly completed Application and Calculation Sheet. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/10/2018. (lej)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Harold Shawgnessy Sims. (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Boyde et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herald Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Craighead County Sheriff Staff; Craighead County Detention Center OIC and Nurse on duty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Shawgnessy Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?