Doshier et al v. Twitter Inc

Plaintiff: William F Doshier and dotStrategy Co
Defendant: Twitter Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00700
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 19 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/7/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/22/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/07/2018. (tmw)
November 7, 2018 18 RESPONSE in Support re #13 First MOTION for Order To File Surreply to Twitter, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(3) or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by William F Doshier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Hodges, David)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER granting #13 motion to file surreply to defendant Twitter, Inc.'s reply in support of its motion to dismiss; and directing Mr. Doshier and dotStrategy to file their proposed surreply within 7 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/6/2018. (cmn)
November 6, 2018 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion for Discovery filed by William F Doshier. (Hodges, David)
November 6, 2018 15 MOTION for Discovery by William F Doshier (Hodges, David)
November 6, 2018 14 AFFIDAVIT of William Doshier by William F Doshier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hodges, David)
November 5, 2018 13 First MOTION for Order To File Surreply to Twitter, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(3) or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by William F Doshier (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Hodges, David)
November 1, 2018 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Twitter Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
October 22, 2018 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(3), or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Twitter Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER granting #9 Twitter Inc's unopposed motion for leave to file a reply brief in support of its pending motion to dismiss; and directing Twitter to file its proposed reply within 7 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/22/2018. (cmn)
October 19, 2018 9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of its Pending Motion to Dismiss by Twitter Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
October 18, 2018 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Remand to State Court filed by William F Doshier, dotStrategy Co. (Hodges, David)
October 18, 2018 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by William F Doshier, dotStrategy Co (Hodges, David)
October 11, 2018 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by William F Doshier, dotStrategy Co. (Hodges, David)
October 11, 2018 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(3), or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by William F Doshier, dotStrategy Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hodges, David)
September 28, 2018 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Twitter Inc. (Attachments: #1 Anderson Decl, #2 Exhibit A- Anderson Decl, #3 Exhibit B- Anderson Decl, #4 Exhibit C- Anderson Decl, #5 Huffman Decl, #6 Exhibit A- Huffman Decl, #7 Exhibit B- Huffman Decl, #8 Exhibit C- Huffman Decl, #9 Exhibit D- Huffman Decl, #10 Exhibit E- Huffman Decl, #11 Querubin Decl, #12 Exhibit A- Querubin Decl, #13 Exhibit B- Querubin Decl, #14 Exhibit C- Querubin Decl, #15 Exhibit D- Querubin Decl, #16 Exhibit E- Querubin Decl, #17 Exhibit F- Querubin Decl, #18 Exhibit G- Querubin Decl, #19 Exhibit H- Querubin Decl, #20 Exhibit I- Querubin Decl, #21 Exhibit J- Querubin Decl)(Doan, Jennifer)
September 28, 2018 3 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(3), or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Twitter Inc (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2018 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by William F Doshier and dotStrategy Co against Twitter Inc. (cmn)
September 21, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Twitter Inc from Faulkner County Circuit Court, case number 23CV-18-1102. Fee $400 receipt number LIT068891. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doshier et al v. Twitter Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F Doshier
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: dotStrategy Co
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Roeser
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?