Davidson v. Thompson et al

Plaintiff: David A Davidson
Defendant: Thompson, Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility and Turn Key
Case Number: 4:2018cv00701
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: Jerome T Kearney
1 Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff's present custodian to collect monthly payments from Plaintiff's institutional account until a total of $350 has been paid to the Clerk of the Court; directing the Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint form denying without prejudice #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Service; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Pulaski County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/11/2018. (kdr)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/11/2018. (lmc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Service by David A Davidson. (cel)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants filed by David A Davidson. (cel)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David A Davidson. (cel)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing Plaintiff to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed ifp application, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the prison, within 30 days of the entry of this Order; denying without prejudice #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Service; directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Business Office and Administrator of the Pulaski County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/24/2018. (kdr)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Service by David A Davidson. (cel)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants filed by David A Davidson.(cel)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David A Davidson. (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?