Sutterfield v. Chenal Healthcare LLC et al
Plaintiff: LaGatha Sutterfield
Defendant: Say La Vie LLC, ALG LaVie LLC, Senior Care LaVie LLC, Diamond Senior Living LLC, Coastal Administrative Services LLC, LV Operations II LLC, MCP LaVie LLC, Hilltopper Holding Corp, Centennial Master Tenant LLC, Centennial Newco Holding Company LLC, Shoreline Healthcare Management LLC, LV Investment LLC, Centennial Healthcare Holding Company LLC, Roseann D Owens, LV Operations I LLC, Centennial Healthcare Properties LLC, LaVie Care Centers LLC, Centennial Healthcare Investment Corporation, Chenal Healthcare LLC, Centennial Healthcare Corporation, Centennial Healthcare Management Corporation, CMC II LLC and FC Investors XXI LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00747
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by LaGatha Sutterfield. (Francis, Robert)
November 16, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Response to Motion, #12 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filer as "Centennial Healthcare Holding Company LLC as marked on the documents. (jak)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Response to Motion filed by Centennial Healthcare Holding Company LLC. (Sallings, Jerry) (Docket text modified on 11/16/2018 to correct the party filer) (jak)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Centennial Healthcare Holding Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration and lease, #2 Exhibit Employment Agreement)(Sallings, Jerry) (Docket text modified on 11/16/2018 to correct the party filer)(jak)
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Remand to State Court filed by LaGatha Sutterfield. (Francis, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by LaGatha Sutterfield (Francis, Robert)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Roseann D Owens.(Sallings, Jerry)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/18/2018; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/2/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/29/2018. (tmw)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Centennial Healthcare Holding Company LLC.(Sallings, Jerry)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by ALG LaVie LLC, CMC II LLC, Centennial Healthcare Corporation, Centennial Healthcare Investment Corporation, Centennial Healthcare Management Corporation, Centennial Healthcare Properties LLC, Centennial Master Tenant LLC, Centennial Newco Holding Company LLC, Coastal Administrative Services LLC, FC Investors XXI LLC, Hilltopper Holding Corp, LV Investment LLC, LV Operations I LLC, LV Operations II LLC, LaVie Care Centers LLC, MCP LaVie LLC, Say La Vie LLC, Senior Care LaVie LLC, Shoreline Healthcare Management LLC.(cmn)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Chenal Healthcare LLC.(cmn)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Diamond Senior Living LLC.(cmn)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by LaGatha Sutterfield against All Defendants.(cmn)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Centennial Healthcare Holding Company LLC from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-18-5758. Fee $400 receipt number LIT069144. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutterfield v. Chenal Healthcare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Say La Vie LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALG LaVie LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Care LaVie LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Senior Living LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fletcher
Represented By: Samantha Leflar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Administrative Services LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Operations II LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCP LaVie LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilltopper Holding Corp
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Master Tenant LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Newco Holding Company LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoreline Healthcare Management LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Investment LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Holding Company LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseann D Owens
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Operations I LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Properties LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaVie Care Centers LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Investment Corporation
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chenal Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Management Corporation
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC II LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FC Investors XXI LLC
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaGatha Sutterfield
Represented By: Katherine Anne Donoven
Represented By: Robert William Francis
Represented By: Brooklyn Rae Parker
Represented By: Brent Lee Moss
Represented By: Brian David Reddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?