Graham v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Larry Graham
Defendant: Julie A Shimer, Windstream Holdings Inc, Larry Laque, Carol B Armitage, William G Laperch, Samuel E Beall, III, Walter L Turek, Anthony W Thomas, Michael G Stoltz, Alan L Wells, Robert E Gunderman, Marc F Stoll, Jeffrey T Hinson, Jeannie Diefenderfer and Kristi Moody
Case Number: 4:2018cv00755
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Cases associated. Create association to 4:18-cv-00709-JM per #11 Order. (ljb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Stipulation and Agreed Motion to Consolidate Actions, Appoint Lead Counsel, and Defer Response Deadlines. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/15/2018. (ljb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 , #7 , and #8 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Brian J. Robbins, Ashley R. Rifkin, and Stephen J. Oddo are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/15/2018. (ljb)
November 15, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Stipulation. CORRECTION: The docket text entry was modified to correct the filing event as "STIPULATION and Agreed MOTION to Consolidate Actions, Appoint Lead Counsel, and Defer Response Deadlines by Larry Graham" as marked on the document. (jak)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION and Agreed MOTION to Consolidate Actions, Appoint Lead Counsel, and Defer Response Deadlines by Larry Graham. (Poynter, Scott)(Docket text modified on 11/15/2018 to correct the filing event)(jak)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stephen Oddo. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3351595. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Poynter, Scott)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Ashley R. Rifkin. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3351594. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Poynter, Scott)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Brian J. Robbins. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3351593. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Poynter, Scott)
October 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to Windstream Holdings Inc and returned to plaintiff's counsel for service upon defendant. (jap)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint Filing of Plaintiffs' Verification of Shareholder Derivative Complaint (Poynter, Scott)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to 3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Notice of Related Case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the Honorable James M. Moody. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/12/18. (mmb)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Larry Graham; Case Number 4:18-cv-709-JM. (ljb)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Larry Graham. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT069191.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A Shimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windstream Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Laque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol B Armitage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G Laperch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel E Beall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter L Turek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony W Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan L Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Gunderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc F Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey T Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Diefenderfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Graham
Represented By: Ashley R. Rifkin
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?