Tackett v. Mattingly et al
Plaintiff: Donnie Tackett
Defendant: Kelli Taylor, Scotty L Hodges, Joey Bedsole, Vicki Garrett, Jimmy Taylor and David J Mattingly
Case Number: 4:2018cv00798
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vicki Garrett, Jimmy Taylor, Kelli Taylor. (Ellis, George)
November 27, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Response to Motion. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the Brief in Support was filed as an attachment to #6 Response in error. The Brief in Support was filed separately by the Clerk's office as docket entry #7 . (jak)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Response to Motion, filed by Donnie Tackett. (jak)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Document brief in support - Filed in Error)(Maples, Cheryl)(Docket text modified on 11/27/2018 to indicate the brief in support was filed as an attachment in error) (jak)
November 21, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 Notice of Appearance and #5 Answer to Complaint. CORRECTION: Each docket entry was modified to correct the party filers to include Defendant Joey Bedsole, as stated in the documents. (thd)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Scotty L Hodges, David J Mattingly and Joe Bedsole.(Monaghan, Sara) (Docket entry modified on 11/21/2018 to correct the party filers.)(thd).
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Monaghan on behalf of Scotty L Hodges, David J Mattingly and Joe Bedsole (Monaghan, Sara) (Docket entry modified on 11/21/2018 to correct the party filers.) (thd).
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion to Dismiss filed by Vicki Garrett, Jimmy Taylor, Kelli Taylor. (Ellis, George)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Vicki Garrett, Jimmy Taylor, Kelli Taylor (Ellis, George)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Donnie Tackett. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400. paid, Receipt #LIT069351.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tackett v. Mattingly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Taylor
Represented By: George D. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotty L Hodges
Represented By: Sara Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Bedsole
Represented By: Sara Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Garrett
Represented By: George D. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Taylor
Represented By: George D. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J Mattingly
Represented By: Sara Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Tackett
Represented By: Cheryl K. Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?