Macdonald v. USAA Savings Bank
Plaintiff: David Macdonald
Defendant: USAA Savings Bank
Case Number: 4:2018cv00811
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 521
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John T. Coghlan is admitted to the bar of this Court for the limited purpose of appearing as counsel for Defendant in this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/29/2018. (jjb)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David M. Krueger is admitted to the bar of this Court for the limited purpose of appearing as counsel for Defendant in this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/29/2018. (jjb)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by USAA Savings Bank (Davis, Frederick)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by John T. Coghlan. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3359324. Filed by USAA Savings Bank (Davis, Frederick)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by David M. Krueger. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3359310. Filed by USAA Savings Bank (Davis, Frederick)
November 28, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Initial Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the signature of the Order as "Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/27/2018" as marked on the document. (jak)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Hart Davis on behalf of USAA Savings Bank (Davis, Frederick)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/4/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/19/2019; Jury Trial set for 12/2/2019 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom # A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/27/2018. (hml)(Docket text modified on 11/28/2018 to correct the signature of the Order) (jak)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA Savings Bank.(Davis, Frederick)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet , filed by David Macdonald. USAA Savings Bank served on 11/6/2018. (Dykes, Alyson)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by David Macdonald against USAA Savings Bank. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069401. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macdonald v. USAA Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Macdonald
Represented By: Alyson J. Dykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Savings Bank
Represented By: John T. Coghlan
Represented By: David M. Krueger
Represented By: Frederick Hart Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?