Sierra Club et al v. Entergy Arkansas Inc et al
Plaintiff: National Parks Conservation Association and Sierra Club
Defendant: Entergy Power LLC, Entergy Mississippi Inc, Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Mississippi LLC and Entergy Arkansas LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00854
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #58 second agreed motion for extension of time; staying the deadline for filing an answer or other responsive pleading; granting #59 Entergy Companies' motion to withdraw Mr. Goodwin as co-counsel; and directing the Clerk to terminate Mr. Goodwin as co-counsel of record for the Entergy Companies. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/24/2020. (ajt)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: Opening briefs may be filed by any party and proposed intervenor and are due by 03/23/2020, 30 days from entry of the Court's Order. Response briefs may be filed within 30 days from filing of the opening brief to which it is responding. Reply briefs may be filed within 15 days from filing of the response brief to which it is replying. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/21/2020. (ajt)
February 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #63 Order Reassigning Case. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
February 3, 2020 Filing 63 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (jbh) (Docket text modified on 2/3/2020 to indicate the document was filed in error) (jak)
January 17, 2020 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition. (Allison, Mark)
January 17, 2020 Filing 61 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by Consumer Utilities Rate Advocacy Division. (Tacker, Sarah)
January 16, 2020 Filing 60 STATUS REPORT by National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club. (Melver, Naomi)
January 14, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Entergy Arkansas LLC, Entergy Mississippi LLC, Entergy Power LLC (Goodwin, Micah)
January 14, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION to Extend Time Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time by Entergy Arkansas LLC, Entergy Mississippi LLC, Entergy Power LLC (Peiserich, John)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney Danica L. Milios and to substitute counsel for Mark Walters. Danica L. Milios shall appear as counsel for intervenor Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/10/2020. (jbh)
January 8, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Danica L. Milios. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3611761. Filed by Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition (Allison, Mark)
December 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #54 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the party filers to include National Parks Conservation Association and to indicate the document is filed against "all Defendants". (thd)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER directing defendants to file a new motion for extension of time if defendants again want to stay the response deadline with respect to the amended complaint; directing all parties and the proposed intervenors to file a joint status report, or separate status reports if unable to agree upon a joint status report, within 30 days from the entry of this Order; and directing the parties and proposed intervenors to inform the Court with respect to the status of this case and to propose a briefing schedule for the issues raised in the Court's 9/30/2019, Order in that status report. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/19/2019. (jbh)
December 17, 2019 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants, filed by Sierra Club and National Parks Conservation Association. (Melver, Naomi) (Docket entry modified on 12/24/2019 to correct the party filers and to indicate the document is filed against Defendants.) (thd).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER directing the parties to brief further specific issues identified in this Order; and taking under advisement the #17 , #26 , #44 , #45 , #46 pending motions. The Court will set a briefing schedule and hearing on the pending motions, after consultation with the parties. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/30/2019. (jbh)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #29 motion for admission pro hac vice of attorneys Mark Walters and Mike Nasi. Mr. Walters and Mr. Nasi shall appear as counsel for proposed intervenor Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/30/2019. (jbh)
February 21, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Response, #46 MOTION for Leave to File Abeyance and for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Settlement Agreement as a Consent Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hays, George)
February 20, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Response, #46 MOTION for Leave to File Abeyance and for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Settlement Agreement as a Consent Judgment filed by Entergy Arkansas LLC, Entergy Mississippi LLC, Entergy Power LLC. (Perkins, G.)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 agreed motion for extension of time; and staying the deadline for filing an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/12/2019. (cmn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Extend Time Agreed Motion for Extension of Time by Entergy Arkansas LLC, Entergy Mississippi LLC, Entergy Power LLC (Perkins, G.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Support re #44 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Entergy Arkansas LLC, Entergy Mississippi LLC, Entergy Power LLC. (Peiserich, John)
February 8, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Abeyance and for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Settlement Agreement as a Consent Judgment by Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition (Allison, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Response by Consumer Utilities Rate Advocacy Division (Baker, Christina)
January 25, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Document Brief in Support)(Hays, George)
January 23, 2019 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants by Sierra Club, National Parks Conservation Association. (Hays, George)
January 22, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief or Briefs in Support of the Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #26 MOTION to Intervene filed by Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A White Bluff Ownership Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B ISES Ownership Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Entergy Petition for Declaratory Order, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Entergy Petition for Interim Rate, #5 Exhibit Ex. E Order No. 21, #6 Exhibit Ex. F Order No. 5, #7 Exhibit Ex. G Docket Summary Sheet 12-008-U, #8 Exhibit Ex. H Order No. 14, #9 Exhibit Ex. I Docket Summary Sheet 15-021-U, #10 Exhibit Ex. J Order No. 13, #11 Exhibit Ex. K Application, #12 Exhibit Ex. L Docket Summary Sheet 15-034-U, #13 Exhibit Ex. M Order No. 7, #14 Exhibit Ex. N Order No. 1)(Allison, Mark)
January 22, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Intervene filed by Consumer Utilities Rate Advocacy Division. (Baker, Christina)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 , #38 proposed intervenors' motions for leave to file reply brief or briefs. CURAD and the Coalition shall have up to and including 1/22/2019, to file a reply brief or briefs in support of their respective motions to intervene. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/16/2019. (cmn)
January 15, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief or Briefs in Support of the Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #37 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Brief of Briefs In Support of Intervention filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hays, George)
January 11, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief or Briefs in Support of the Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition's Motion to Intervene by Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order No. 1)(Allison, Mark)
January 11, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Brief of Briefs In Support of Intervention by Consumer Utilities Rate Advocacy Division (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, Christina)
January 4, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Intervene Filed by ARKANSAS AFFORDABLE ENERGY COALITION filed by Entergy Arkansas LLC, Entergy Mississippi LLC, Entergy Power LLC. (Peiserich, John)
January 3, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Intervene, #26 MOTION to Intervene filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hays, George)
January 3, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Intervene filed by CURAD Division of the Arkansas Attorney General filed by Entergy Arkansas LLC, Entergy Mississippi LLC, Entergy Power LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Kurtis W. Castleberry)(Peiserich, John)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting plaintiffs an extension of time up to and including 1/3/2019, to file a response to #17 proposed intervenor's motion to intervene. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/21/2018. (cmn)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #24 motion for extension of time filed by defendants up to and including 1/3/2019, to respond to #17 proposed intervenor's motion to intervene; and writing to address #25 12/18/2018 correspondence filed by the State of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/21/2018. (cmn)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #23 defendants' motion to substitute parties; dismissing EAI and EMI from this case and substituting Entergy Arkansas, LLC and Entergy Mississippi, LLC in their respective places; and directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate EAI and EMI as party defendants and substitute Entergy Arkansas, LLC and Entergy Mississippi, LLC, as the named defendants. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/21/2018. (cmn)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #19 , #20 , #21 , #22 motions for admission pro hac vice of attorneys Kimberly Bennett, Susan Margaret Floyd, Debra J. Jezouit, and Timothy K. Webster. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/21/2018. (cmn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Mark Walters and Mike Nasi filed by Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition. Fee $200.00 received. Receipt number LIT070125. (fjg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Mississippi Inc, Entergy Power LLC Notice of Filing Letter from US Department of Justice (Attachments: #1 Document Letter from DOJ)(Peiserich, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #26 Motion to Intervene filed by Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition. (fjg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Intervene filed by Arkansas Affordable Energy Coalition. (fjg)
December 18, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Intervene, #18 Brief in Support filed by Consumer Utilities Rate Advocacy Division. (Baker, Christina)
December 17, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Intervene, #18 Brief in Support by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Mississippi Inc, Entergy Power LLC (Perkins, G.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Substitute Party by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Mississippi Inc, Entergy Power LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Peiserich, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Timothy K. Webster. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3369059. Filed by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Mississippi Inc, Entergy Power LLC (Peiserich, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Debra J. Jezouit. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3369056. Filed by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Mississippi Inc, Entergy Power LLC (Peiserich, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Susan Margaret Floyd. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3369053. Filed by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Mississippi Inc, Entergy Power LLC (Peiserich, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kimberly Bennett. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3369045. Filed by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Mississippi Inc, Entergy Power LLC (Peiserich, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #17 Motion to Intervene filed by Consumer Utilities Rate Advocacy Division. (fjg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Intervene filed by Consumer Utilities Rate Advocacy Division. (fjg)
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Settlement Agreement 45-Day Review and Comment Deadline (Hays, George)
November 19, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Entergy Arkansas Inc. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error (duplicate of docket entry #6 ) based on a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. (thd)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on 13 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker. (jak)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club (Melver, Naomi)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/16/18. (mmb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error - wrong image file. The correct document was added to #6 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lodging of Settlement Agreement by National Parks Conservation Association and Sierra Club. (kdr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Entergy Power LLC identifying Corporate Parent Entergy Asset Management Inc, Corporate Parent Entergy Power Investment Holding Inc, and Corporate Parent Entergy Amalgamated Competitive Holdings LLC for Entergy Power LLC. (kdr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Entergy Mississippi Inc identifying Corporate Parent Entergy Corporation for Entergy Mississippi Inc. (kdr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Naomi Kim Melver on behalf of National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club (Melver, Naomi)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (duplicate of Docket Entry #6 ). (kdr) (Docket text modified on 11/19/2018.) (thd).
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Entergy Arkansas Inc identifying Corporate Parent Entergy Corporation for Entergy Arkansas Inc. (kdr) Additional attachment added on 11/16/2018: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of George E. Hays on behalf of National Parks Conservation Association and Sierra Club. (kdr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Micah Goodwin on behalf of Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Mississippi Inc and Entergy Power LLC. (kdr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of G. Alan Perkins on behalf of Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Mississippi Inc and Entergy Power LLC. (kdr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of John F. Peiserich on behalf of Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Mississippi Inc and Entergy Power LLC. (kdr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Sierra Club, National Parks Conservation Association. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT069644. Summons not issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club et al v. Entergy Arkansas Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Power LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Bennett
Represented By: Susan Margaret Floyd
Represented By: Micah Goodwin
Represented By: Debra J. Jezouit
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Timothy K. Webster
Represented By: John F. Peiserich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Mississippi Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Bennett
Represented By: Susan Margaret Floyd
Represented By: Micah Goodwin
Represented By: Debra J. Jezouit
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Timothy K. Webster
Represented By: John F. Peiserich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Arkansas Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Bennett
Represented By: Susan Margaret Floyd
Represented By: Micah Goodwin
Represented By: Debra J. Jezouit
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Timothy K. Webster
Represented By: John F. Peiserich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Mississippi LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Bennett
Represented By: Susan Margaret Floyd
Represented By: Micah Goodwin
Represented By: Debra J. Jezouit
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Timothy K. Webster
Represented By: John F. Peiserich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Arkansas LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Bennett
Represented By: Susan Margaret Floyd
Represented By: Micah Goodwin
Represented By: Debra J. Jezouit
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Timothy K. Webster
Represented By: John F. Peiserich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Represented By: Naomi Kim Melver
Represented By: George E. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Represented By: Naomi Kim Melver
Represented By: George E. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?