Walker-Swinton v. Philander Smith College et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Walker-Swinton
Defendant: Zollie Stevenson, Jr, Roderick Smothers, Sr and Philander Smith College
Case Number: 4:2018cv00886
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #23 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike Reply filed by Patricia Walker-Swinton. (Bloodman, Teresa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Strike #13 Reply to Response to Motion, Plaintiff's Unauthorized Reply filed by Patricia Walker-Swinton. (Bloodman, Teresa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Zollie Stevenson, Jr. (Witherspoon, Carolyn)
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Zollie Stevenson, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Proof of Service)(Witherspoon, Carolyn)
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss Complaint filed by Patricia Walker-Swinton. (Bloodman, Teresa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Defective Summons and Service Pursuant to Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Patricia Walker-Swinton. (Bloodman, Teresa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Extend Time , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Defective Summons and Service Pursuant to Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure () by Patricia Walker-Swinton (Bloodman, Teresa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Disqualify Counsel and to Strike Complaint as a Nullity filed by Patricia Walker-Swinton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bloodman, Teresa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and to Strike Complaint as a Nullity filed by Patricia Walker-Swinton. (Bloodman, Teresa)
January 10, 2019 Summons Reissued as to Philander Smith College, Roderick Smothers, Sr, Zollie Stevenson, Jr. and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Unauthorized Reply filed by Philander Smith College. (Witherspoon, Carolyn) (Docket text modified on 1/15/2019 to correct a typographical error pursuant to instruction from the filing attorney)(jak)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike #13 Reply to Response to Motion, Plaintiff's Unauthorized Reply by Philander Smith College (Witherspoon, Carolyn)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and to Strike Complaint as a Nullity, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Defective Summons and Service Pursuant to Rule filed by Patricia Walker-Swinton. (Bloodman, Teresa)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and to Strike Complaint as a Nullity, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Defective Summons and Service Pursuant to Rule filed by Philander Smith College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to T. Bloodman Dated October 4, 2018)(Witherspoon, Carolyn)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Philander Smith College (Witherspoon, Carolyn)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and to Strike Complaint as a Nullity, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Defective Summons and Service Pursuant to Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Patricia Walker-Swinton (Bloodman, Teresa)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Patricia Walker-Swinton. Roderick Smothers, Sr served on 12/1/2018. (Bloodman, Teresa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Philander Smith College, Roderick Smothers, Sr. (Witherspoon, Carolyn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Defective Summons and Service Pursuant to Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Philander Smith College, Roderick Smothers, Sr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defective Summons)(Witherspoon, Carolyn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Philander Smith College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge of Discrimination)(Witherspoon, Carolyn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Disqualify Counsel,, and to Strike Complaint as a Nullity filed by All Defendants. (Witherspoon, Carolyn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and to Strike Complaint as a Nullity by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Article from Ark. Democrat Gazette (May 21, 2018), #2 Exhibit Order of Interim Suspension (March 21, 2016), #3 Exhibit Nunc Pro Tunc Revised Findings and Order on Remand (October 4, 2016), #4 Exhibit Petition for Disbarment (April 1, 2016), #5 Exhibit Information from the Arkansas Administrative Office of the Court, #6 Exhibit Procedures of the Arkansas Supreme Court Regulating Professional Conduct of Attorneys at Law)(Witherspoon, Carolyn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn B. Witherspoon on behalf of Philander Smith College, Roderick Smothers, Sr, Zollie Stevenson, Jr (Witherspoon, Carolyn)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document did not have the cover sheet added as an attachment to the complaint due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The cover sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review on the parties. (jak)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Patricia Walker-Swinton against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069762. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (cmn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker-Swinton v. Philander Smith College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Walker-Swinton
Represented By: Teresa L. Bloodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zollie Stevenson, Jr
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Smothers, Sr
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philander Smith College
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?