Branson v. Little Rock, City of

Plaintiff: Terri Branson
Defendant: Little Rock, City of
Case Number: 4:2018cv00902
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/18/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/1/2019. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 1/8/19. (mmb)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Carpenter on behalf of All Defendants (Carpenter, Thomas)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Little Rock, City of.(Hogan, Rick)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick D. Hogan on behalf of All Defendants (Hogan, Rick)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Little Rock, City of filed by Terri Branson. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT069900.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branson v. Little Rock, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock, City of
Represented By: Thomas M. Carpenter
Represented By: Rick D. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Branson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?