Thompson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Kenya Thompson
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00905
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Khayyam Marice Eddings on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Eddings, Khayyam)
January 3, 2019 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/13/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/27/2019; and Jury Trial set for 12/16/2019 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom # A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/3/19. (hml)
January 2, 2019 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Patrick McKay on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (McKay, Joseph)
January 2, 2019 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(McKay, Joseph)
December 17, 2018 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint & Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge, filed by Kenya Thompson. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 12/13/2018. (Wolff, Nelson)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kenya Thompson against Union Pacific Railroad Company. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069906. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Joseph Patrick McKay
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Thompson
Represented By: Nelson Gregory Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?