Hudson v. Rice et al

Plaintiff: Brian Hudson
Defendant: Randall, Huffman, Andrews, Matt Rice and Reidmiller
Case Number: 4:2019cv00032
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: Brian S Miller
1 Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brian Hudson.(kdr)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Hudson a 1983 complaint form that is labeled "Amended Complaint;" and directing Hudson to file, within 30 days of the date of this Order, an Amended Complaint that complies with the instructions in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/17/2019. (kdr)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's institutional account until a total of $350 has been paid to the Clerk; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Faulkner County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/16/2019. (kdr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brian Hudson. (llg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Hudson. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Rice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reidmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?