Wood v. Bank OZK et al
Plaintiff: Ryan A Wood
Defendant: Gregory McKinney, Bank OZK and George Gleason
Case Number: 4:2019cv00042
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 52 CLERK'S NOTICE re #51 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (cmn)
February 22, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ryan A Wood (jap)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #44 , #45 , #46 , and #47 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants. Robert A. Jaffe, Joseph A. Ingrisano, Joseph Warin, and Jason J. Mendro are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/24/2019. (ljb)
January 24, 2019 Filing 49 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #48 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER directing the clerk to reassign this case to United States District Judge James Moody, Jr. It involves the same facts and legal issues as Case No. 4:18-cv-793-JM, and transfer will conserve significant judicial resources. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/24/2019. (kdr)
January 22, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jason J. Mendro. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3388657. Filed by All Defendants (Askew, Jess)
January 22, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by F. Joseph Warin. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3388654. Filed by All Defendants (Askew, Jess)
January 22, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Joseph A. Ingrisano. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3388650. Filed by All Defendants (Askew, Jess)
January 22, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert A. Jaffe. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3388638. Filed by Bank OZK, George Gleason, Gregory McKinney (Askew, Jess)
January 18, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jess L. Askew, III on behalf of All Defendants (Askew, Jess)
January 18, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew King on behalf of All Defendants (King, Andrew)
January 17, 2019 Filing 41 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-10800. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 17, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of Arkansas. (anc) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS granting #37 Motion to Transfer Case. The Court finds that the motion should be and is hereby GRANTED as follows: This case is hereby transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all motions pending on the docket and transfer the case to the Eastern District of Arkansas forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/17/2019) (anc)[Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
January 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #39 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Bank OZK, George Gleason, Gregory McKinney. Related Document Number: [Docket 37]. (Jaffe, Robert) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION to Transfer Case to E.D. Arkansas. . Document filed by Bank OZK, George Gleason, Gregory McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Colbert v. Bank OZK E.D. Ark., #2 Exhibit Order form E.D. Ark)(Jaffe, Robert) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Transfer Case to E.D. Arkansas. Document filed by Bank OZK, George Gleason, Gregory McKinney.(Jaffe, Robert) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Strathclyde Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Ben Cummings. (Apton, Adam) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Order in Related Action re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Strathclyde Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Strathclyde Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LP Order in Colbert v. Bank OZK (E.D. Ark. Jan. 10, 2019))(Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: On October 26, 2018, notice was published advising members of the putative plaintiff class of this action. The deadline, therefore, for any member of the putative plaintiff class to move the Court to serve as lead plaintiff was December 26, 2018. See 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(A)(i)(II). On December 26, 2018, several members of the putative plaintiff class in this case filed motions to serve as lead plaintiffs and for approval of their respective choices of counsel (the "Motions"). See ECF Nos. 15, 19, 21, 23, 25, 27, 30. Any oppositions to the Motions are due no later than January 17, 2019. Replies, if any, are due no later than January 24, 2019. ( Responses due by 1/17/2019, Replies due by 1/24/2019.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/8/2019) (mro) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. Any motion to transfer this action to the Eastern District of Arkansas pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) is due no later than January 16, 2019. Any motion should be accompanied by a proposed form of order. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 1/16/2019.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/8/2019) (rjm) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re: #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. MOTION to Appoint David Hanshaw to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by David Hanshaw. (Kim, Phillip) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #28 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #22 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #17 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the parties hereto, through their undersigned counsel, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, as follows: Undersigned counsel for Defendants is authorized to accept, and hereby does accept, service of the Complaint in the Action on behalf of Defendants. Defendants are under no current obligation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint and may defer any answer or other response until after (i) an order is entered by the Court appointing a Lead Plaintiff and approving Lead Plaintiff's selection of Lead Counsel pursuant to the PSLRA (15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B)), and (ii) a scheduling order setting forth the timing for the filing of a consolidated or amended complaint and Defendants' response(s) thereto is entered by the Court. The parties stipulate and agree that no more than fourteen (14) days after a lead plaintiff has been appointed and Lead Counsel has been approved by the Court in accordance with the PSLRA, counsel for Defendants and Lead Counsel shall meet and confer on, and thereafter shall submit, a proposed schedule for the filing of a consolidated or amended complaint and Defendants' response(s) thereto. Defendants reserve all of their respective rights, claims and defenses, including but not limited to, all defenses relating to jurisdiction, other than a defense as to the sufficiency of service of the Complaint. Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to the date established in the Court's anticipated order appointing a Lead Plaintiff, approving Lead Plaintiff's selection of Lead Counsel pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B), and establishing the deadlines for either a consolidated or amended complaint and Defendants' response thereto. The Court takes no position on the remainder of the stipulation between the parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/26/2018) (rro) Modified on 12/28/2018 (rro). [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: #27 MOTION to Appoint Paul Williams, Sandra K. Schneider, Bernard P. Schneider and Gregory Pope to serve as lead plaintiff(s) - Notice of Motion and Motion of Ozark Investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Gregory Pope, Bernard P. Schneider, Sandra K. Schneider, Paul Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Appoint Paul Williams, Sandra K. Schneider, Bernard P. Schneider and Gregory Pope to serve as lead plaintiff(s) - Notice of Motion and Motion of Ozark Investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel. . Document filed by Gregory Pope, Bernard P. Schneider, Sandra K. Schneider, Paul Williams. (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Gregory Pope, Bernard P. Schneider, Sandra K. Schneider, Paul Williams. Related Document Number: #27 . (Lieberman, Jeremy) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Paul Williams, Sandra K. Schneider, Bernard P. Schneider and Gregory Pope to serve as lead plaintiff(s) - Notice of Motion and Motion of Ozark Investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Gregory Pope, Bernard P. Schneider, Sandra K. Schneider, Paul Williams.(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff in the First Filed Case re: #15 Notice (Other). Document filed by John Gauvin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stocker, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 25 DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Strathclyde Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Strathclyde Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, #4 Exhibit D - Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume)(Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Strathclyde Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Strathclyde Pension Fund. (Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint Strathclyde Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Strathclyde Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Ben Cummings. Related Document Number: #19 . (Apton, Adam) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Adam M. Apton in Support re: #19 MOTION to Appoint Ben Cummings to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Ben Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Apton, Adam) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION to Appoint Ben Cummings to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Ben Cummings. (Apton, Adam) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Ben Cummings to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Ben Cummings.(Apton, Adam) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. MOTION to Appoint David Hanshaw to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by David Hanshaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Early Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume)(Kim, Phillip) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by David Hanshaw. Related Document Number: [Docket No. 16]. (Kim, Phillip) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.., MOTION to Appoint David Hanshaw to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by David Hanshaw.(Kim, Phillip) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff in the First Filed Case. Document filed by John Gauvin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stocker, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corporation for Bank OZK. Document filed by Bank OZK, George Gleason, Gregory McKinney.(Jaffe, Robert) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ryan A. Wood. (Hood, Joseph) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert A. Jaffe to RE-FILE Document #12 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bank OZK, George Gleason, Gregory McKinney.(Jaffe, Robert) Modified on 12/21/2018 (lb). [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert A. Jaffe on behalf of Bank OZK, George Gleason, Gregory McKinney. (Jaffe, Robert) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank OZK, George Gleason, Gregory McKinney. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Bank OZK, George Gleason, Gregory McKinney, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryan A. Wood. (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gregory McKinney. (dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Gleason. (dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank OZK. (dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 20, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ryan A Wood. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gregory McKinney, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryan A Wood. (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George Gleason, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryan A Wood. (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank OZK, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryan A Wood. (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank OZK, George Gleason, Gregory McKinney. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15933968)Document filed by Ryan A Wood.(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from nysd on 1/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Bank OZK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory McKinney
Represented By: Robert A. Jaffe
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: F. Joseph Warin
Represented By: Joseph A. Ingrisano
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank OZK
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Represented By: Robert A. Jaffe
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: F. Joseph Warin
Represented By: Joseph A. Ingrisano
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gleason
Represented By: Robert A. Jaffe
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: F. Joseph Warin
Represented By: Joseph A. Ingrisano
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan A Wood
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?