Scott v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Antoine Scott
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00044
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Response to Motion Response to Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Antoine Scott. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM - PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Antoine Scott. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/29/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/13/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/28/2019. (tmw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Eddings, Khayyam)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM - PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Eddings, Khayyam)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Eddings, Khayyam)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Khayyam Marice Eddings on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Eddings, Khayyam)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Antoine Scott. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 1/25/2019. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Antoine Scott against Union Pacific Railroad Company. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT070501. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Scott
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?