Little Rock Family Planning Services et al v. Arkansas Board of Health
Plaintiff: Little Rock Family Planning Services and Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma
Defendant: Arkansas Board of Health
Case Number: 4:2019cv00046
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 19 USCA Appeal Fees received $505.00 receipt number LIT071309 re #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Arkansas Board of Health. (fjg)
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 USCA Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule as to #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Arkansas Board of Health. USCA Case Number 19-1532. (cmn)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER to the Clerk for the Circuit Court of Pulaski County transmitting a copy of the case file and certified copies of #14 Order to Remand and the docket sheet via certified mail. (ljb)
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #15 Notice of Appeal re #14 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. (cmn)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, by Arkansas Board of Health. (Cantrell, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER remanding this case for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to immediately remand this case to the Circuit Court of Pulaski County, Arkansas. Plaintiffs' #9 Motion to Remand is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/13/2019. (ljb)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Arkansas Board of Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bronni, Nicholas)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Christine Clarke is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/25/19. (mmb)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Christine Clarke. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3409817. Filed by Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Brownstein, Bettina)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Remand to State Court filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma. (Brownstein, Bettina)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing in Pulaski Circuit Court)(Brownstein, Bettina)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/1/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/15/2019. Bench Trial set for 2/4/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 1/23/19. (mmb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to #5 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma. (ljb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Arkansas Board of Health. (ljb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Mandate by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma. (ljb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #3 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma. (ljb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Arkansas Board of Health. (ljb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 APPEAL FROM ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION against Arkansas Board of Health filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma. (ljb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arkansas Board of Health from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-18-8090. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT070516. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Rock Family Planning Services et al v. Arkansas Board of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Rock Family Planning Services
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Christine Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Christine Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Board of Health
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?