Magna IV Color Imaging Inc et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Jiaqi Zhao and Magna IV Color Imaging Inc
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 4:2019cv00057
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan on behalf of All Defendants (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jiaqi Zhao, Magna IV Color Imaging Inc. All Defendants. (Ernst, George)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jiaqi Zhao, Magna IV Color Imaging Inc. All Defendants. (Borkowski, Misty)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney Cody Hiland. (llg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General Matthew Whitaker. (llg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kirstjen Nielsen, in her official Capacity, Department of Homeland Security. (llg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Laura B. Zuchowski, Director US Citizenship and Immigration Services Vermont. (llg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna, Director US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (llg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND REVIEW OF AGENCY ACTION against All Defendants filed by Jiaqi Zhao, Magna IV Color Imaging Inc. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT070556.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magna IV Color Imaging Inc et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiaqi Zhao
Represented By: Misty Wilson Borkowski
Represented By: George Raff Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magna IV Color Imaging Inc
Represented By: Misty Wilson Borkowski
Represented By: George Raff Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?