Raynor v. United States Postal Service

Plaintiff: Charles Raynor
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 4:2019cv00064
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. US Attorney General served on 3/11/2019. (fjg)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. US Attorney Eastern District of Arkansas served on 3/7/2019. (fjg)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Megan J Brennan, Postmaster General & Chief served on 3/11/2019. (fjg)
February 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service Postmaster General Megan J. Brennan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare Summons and the Marshal to serve the Summons and Complaint on Defendant without prepayment of costs. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/21/2019. (ljb)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/8/2019. (ljb)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Charles Raynor. (fjg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Defendant's Address filed by Charles Raynor. (fjg)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP; instructing Plaintiff to be familiar and comply with all Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court; and directing Plaintiff to file the Defendant's address on or before 2/19/2019. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/5/2019. (ljb)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/28/2019. (ljb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United States Postal Service filed by Charles Raynor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Raynor. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raynor v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?