Johnson et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Drusella Johnson and Jerry Johnson
Defendant: Herb Miller, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and New Century Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00083
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.(Horton, Johnathan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathan D. Horton on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Horton, Johnathan)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Horton, Johnathan)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Trustee's Affidavit and Certification, #2 Exhibit A-2 Trustee's Affidavit and Certification, #3 Exhibit A-3 Trustee's Affidavit and Certification, #4 Exhibit A-4 Trustee's Affidavit and Certification, #5 Exhibit A-5 Trustee's Affidavit and Certification, #6 Exhibit B 2018 Personal Property Assessment, #7 Exhibit C Quitclaim Deed, #8 Exhibit D Warranty Deed, #9 Exhibit E Assignment of Tangible Personal Property)(Horton, Johnathan)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company; Case Number 4:19-cv-8, 4:18-CV-582, 4:18-CV-435 (Horton, Johnathan)
February 6, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include a reference to the Jury Demand. (thd)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Drusella Johnson, Jerry Johnson against All Defendants.(cmn) (Docket text modified on 2/6/2019 to include a reference to the Jury Demand.)(thd).
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerry Johnson. (cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Johnathan D. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drusella Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?