Jensen v. Sherwood Tire Service Inc
Plaintiff: Chris Jensen
Defendant: Sherwood Tire Service Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00085
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Chris Jensen. (Zwilling, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/29/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/13/2019; and Bench Trial set for 2/24/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom # A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/19/2019. (hml)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Sherwood Tire Service Inc (Hankins, Allen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sherwood Tire Service Inc.(Hankins, Allen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Vaughan Hankins on behalf of Sherwood Tire Service Inc (Hankins, Allen)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chris Jensen against Sherwood Tire Service Inc. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT070693. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. Sherwood Tire Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwood Tire Service Inc
Represented By: Allen Vaughan Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Jensen
Represented By: Edward I. Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?