Johnson v. Williams
Plaintiff: Larry R Johnson
Defendant: Takeiya Lazondria Williams
Case Number: 4:2019cv00086
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/29/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/13/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/28/2019. (tmw)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Takeiya Lazondria Williams.(Drennon, Baxter)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Takeiya Lazondria Williams.(Drennon, Baxter)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Larry R Johnson against Takeiya Lazondria Williams. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT070694. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry R Johnson
Represented By: Kent Tester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeiya Lazondria Williams
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?