CCD Holdings, LLC v. Wal Mart Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: CCD Holdings LLC
Defendant: Cenergy USA Inc, Wal Mart.Com USA LLC, Wal Mart Stores Inc, Magic Dirt Horticultural Products LLC and Magic Dirt LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00102
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #85 Notice of Hearing. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #85 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak)
December 3, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Hearing: MARKMAN HEARING set for 1/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr.(kog) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
November 12, 2019 Filing 84 STATUS REPORT Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by CCD Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart of Disputed Claim Terms, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration)(Mozwecz, Jennifer)
October 29, 2019 Filing 83 REPLY re #80 Response (Non Motion) in Support of Plaintiff's Claim Construction by CCD Holdings LLC. (Mozwecz, Jennifer)
October 29, 2019 Filing 82 REPLY re #81 Response (Non Motion) to Defendants' Claim Construction Brief by Cenergy USA Inc, Magic Dirt Horticultural Products LLC, Magic Dirt LLC, Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal Mart.Com USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 pending application, #2 Exhibit 8 office action summary-1, #3 Exhibit 9 Response to Office Action)(Calhoun, Joseph)
October 22, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE re #76 Brief (non-appeal), by CCD Holdings LLC (Mozwecz, Jennifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE re #78 Brief (non-appeal), to Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief by Cenergy USA Inc, Magic Dirt Horticultural Products LLC, Magic Dirt LLC, Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal Mart.Com USA LLC (Calhoun, Joseph)
September 25, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #77 Addendum. CORRECTION: The exhibit resume was not submitted with the original filing. The exhibit resume was added as an attachment to docket entry #77 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
September 24, 2019 Filing 78 BRIEF filed by CCD Holdings LLC Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Patent 8894879, #2 Exhibit 2 - Patent 8893652, #3 Exhibit 3 - Patent 10244730, #4 Exhibit 4 - Joint Claim Chart)(Mozwecz, Jennifer)
September 24, 2019 Filing 77 ADDENDUM filed by Cenergy USA Inc, Magic Dirt Horticultural Products LLC, Magic Dirt LLC, Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal Mart.Com USA LLC to #76 Brief (non-appeal),. Ex. 6 - Hunt Declaration (Calhoun, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2019: #1 Exhibit 6 - Resume) (jak).
September 24, 2019 Filing 76 BRIEF filed by Cenergy USA Inc, Magic Dirt Horticultural Products LLC, Magic Dirt LLC, Wal Mart Stores Inc, Wal Mart.Com USA LLC Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Calhoun, Joseph)
August 12, 2019 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by CCD Holdings LLC. (Mozwecz, Jennifer)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/2019. (ljb)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/2019. (ljb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #71 Response. CORRECTION: The original exhibits 1 and 2 were not submitted with the docket entry. The exhibits were added to docket entry #71 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
August 5, 2019 Filing 71 RESPONSE to Motion re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by All Defendants. (Calhoun, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (jak).
July 23, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #69 Deficiency Letter. CORRECTION: The deficiency letter document was not attached to the docket entry due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The image file was added to docket entry #69 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
July 23, 2019 Filing 68 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim AND STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by CCD Holdings LLC. (Mozwecz, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 69 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is not accompanied by a supporting brief (Local Rule 7.2(a)). (jak)
July 22, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by CCD Holdings LLC (Mozwecz, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 66 Defendants' ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against CCD Holdings LLC by Wal Mart Stores Inc, Magic Dirt Horticultural Products LLC, Cenergy USA Inc, Magic Dirt LLC, Wal Mart.Com USA LLC.(Calhoun, Joseph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 65 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by CCD Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Document Agreed Protective Order)(Mozwecz, Jennifer)
June 4, 2019 Filing 64 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court. (thd)
June 4, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #62 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document is filed "against all Defendants." The original Exhibit E contained a corrupt image file. The corrected Exhibit E was substituted as an attachment to the entry based on the attached correspondence. (thd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, (Mozwecz, Jennifer) (The original Exhibit E contained an corrupt image file. The corrected #6 Exhibit E was substituted as the attachment on 6/4/2019, and the docket text was modified to indicate the document is filed against "all Defendants".) (thd).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #60 Motion for Leave to File. Upon notice to the Court that Defendants have no objection, Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint is granted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/29/19. (dpb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by CCD Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to SAC, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to SAC, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to SAC, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to SAC, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to SAC)(Mozwecz, Jennifer)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying #50 Defendants' Renewed and Supplemented Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/20/2019. (ljb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 58 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/30/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/13/2019. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 4/27/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr.Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
March 27, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 Supplemental MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Defendants. (Calhoun, Joseph)
March 21, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 Supplemental MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CCD Holdings LLC. (Mozwecz, Jennifer)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Jennifer L. Mozwecz is hereby admitted to appear on behalf of CCD Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/14/2019. (ljb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jennifer L. Mozwecz. Fee $100. Filed by CCD Holdings LLC (Mozwecz, Jennifer)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #47 and #48 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants. Una L. Lauricia and Michael Padden are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/12/2019. (ljb)
March 7, 2019 Filing 52 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #50 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Calhoun, Joseph)
March 7, 2019 Filing 51 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #50 Motion to Dismiss is not accompanied by a supporting brief (Local Rule 7.2(a)). (jak)
March 6, 2019 Filing 50 Supplemental MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Calhoun, Joseph)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Richard Keville and Jaime Renee Simon terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/4/19. (dpb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Michael P. Padden. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3414279. Filed by All Defendants (Calhoun, Joseph)
March 1, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Una L. Lauricia. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3414212. Filed by All Defendants (Calhoun, Joseph)
March 1, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants (Calhoun, Joseph)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #44 Motion to Extend Time. Without objection from Plaintiff, Defendants are given an extension of time until March 6, 2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/22/19. (dpb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Extend Time to File a Response to First Amended Complaint by All Defendants (Calhoun, Joseph)
February 20, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III on behalf of All Defendants (Calhoun, Joseph)
February 7, 2019 Filing 42 Case electronically transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-02749. Electronic file copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
February 7, 2019 Filing 41 TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court of Eastern District of Arkansas the electronic record. (ek, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/6/2019. Mailed notice(gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Order, this Court grants in part Cenergy's motion to dismiss #26 because venue is improper as to Cenergy in this district, and finds that the interests of justice warrant transferring this case to the Eastern District of Arkansas. This Court denies the remainder of Cenergy's motion to dismiss #26 without prejudice, and denies the Walmart Defendants' motion to dismiss #25 without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 2/5/2019. Parties shall meet and confer and contact Chambers regarding the venue issue referenced in court. Defendant's motion to dismiss #26 remains under advisement. The Court will issue a ruling by separate order. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the status hearing previously set for 1/10/2019 is reset for 2/5/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 36 REPLY by Cenergy USA, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #35 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lauricia, Una) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE by CCD Holdings, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Cenergy USA, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction improper venue and failure to state a claim #26 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - DVO Proposal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Press Release)(Mozwecz, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for discovery #28 is denied. Plaintiff shall file any substantive response to Cenergy's motion to dismiss #26 by 11/7/18, and Cenergy shall file any reply by 11/14/18. The case is set for a status hearing on 1/10/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 33 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Cenergy USA, Inc. Exhibit B regarding response in opposition to motion, #32 (Lauricia, Una) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Cenergy USA, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff CCD Holdings, LLC for discovery and extension of time to respond #28 and REPLY in support of Cenergy's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C)(Lauricia, Una) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC to response in opposition to motion #27 (Lauricia, Una) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 10/9/2018. Plaintiff's motion for discovery and extension of time to respond #28 is briefed as follows: response shall be filed on or before 10/11/2018. Motion hearing set for 10/25/2018, to stand. Oral motion for to file under seal is granted. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Lynn Mozwecz for presentment of motion for discovery #28 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/9/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Mozwecz, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff CCD Holdings, LLC for discovery and extension of time to respond (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Indemnity Email)(Mozwecz, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE by CCD Holdings, LLCin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC #25 (Mozwecz, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendant Cenergy USA, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction improper venue and failure to state a claim (Attachments: #1 Declaration Robert Joblin)(Lauricia, Una) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC (Lauricia, Una) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 8/16/2018. Any motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before 9/6/2018; response shall be filed on or before 9/27/2018; reply shall be filed on or before 10/11/2018. Motion hearing set for 10/25/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 23 First AMENDED complaint by CCD Holdings, LLC against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mozwecz, Jennifer) "Duplicate filing of entry no. #22 " Modified on 8/10/2018 (tt, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 22 First AMENDED complaint by CCD Holdings, LLC against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mozwecz, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
July 25, 2018 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Cenergy USA, Inc. at two different locations: 1) 11500 North Rodney Parham Road Little Rock, Arkansas 72212 and 2) 5705 Ridgefield Lane Little Rock, Arkansas 72223. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 7/12/2018. Oral motion for leave to file an amended complaint is granted. Amended complaint shall be filed on or before 8/9/2018. Defendant's motion to dismiss #18 is denied without prejudice. Oral motion for extension of time to serve Cenergy USA, Inc. under Rule 4, is granted. Status hearing set for 8/16/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Defense counsel shall be prepared to make an election as to whether they will answer the amended complaint or revise their motion to dismiss, at the next hearing. Parties shall also be prepared to set additional case management dates at the next hearing. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's motion to dismiss #18 . Plaintiff is advised to review the Courts standing order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Courts homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The Court's Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether he/she will amend the complaint or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. Defendant's motion to dismiss #18 is set for presentment on 7/12/2018. Status hearing date of 8/8/2016 is stricken. Plaintiff shall be prepared to make an election regarding Defendant's motion to dismiss at the next hearing. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Michael P. Padden for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss #18 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/12/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Padden, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. , MOTION by Defendants Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to dismiss for improper venue (Padden, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Una Lauricia's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #16 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14656639. (Lauricia, Una) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC by Michael P. Padden (Padden, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Una Lauricia's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 is moot. Attorney, Una Lauricia shall correct and refile the motion. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14648564. (Lauricia, Una) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's agreed motion to extend time to answer #10 is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 7/6/2018. Initial status hearing previously set for 7/6/2018 is reset for 8/8/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Initial status report shall be filed on or before 7/30/2018. Motion hearing set for 6/21/2018, is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Lynn Mozwecz for presentment of motion to continue #10 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/21/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Mozwecz, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff CCD Holdings, LLC to continue initial status date and responses (Mozwecz, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file answer #6 is granted and answer shall be filed on or before 6/15/2018. Initial status conference previously set for 6/6/2018 is reset for 7/6/2018 at 9:45 a.m in Courtroom 1203; status report shall be filed on or before 6/25/2018. John Keville's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #8 is granted. Motion hearing set for 5/29/2018, is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14479966. on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC (Keville, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Jaime Renee Simon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/29/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Simon, Jaime) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC for extension of time to file answer Or Otherwise Plead To Complaint (Simon, Jaime) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC by Jaime Renee Simon (Simon, Jaime) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Courts own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 6/6/18 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 5/25/18, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
April 24, 2018 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC. (kb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
April 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC. (kb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
April 18, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cenergy USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CCD Holdings, LLC by Jennifer Lynn Mozwecz (Mozwecz, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 2 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
April 17, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (rc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed by CCD Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14362016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mozwecz, Jennifer) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CCD Holdings, LLC v. Wal Mart Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenergy USA Inc
Represented By: Michael P. Padden
Represented By: Una L. Lauricia
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart.Com USA LLC
Represented By: Jaime Renee Simon
Represented By: John Richard Keville
Represented By: Michael P. Padden
Represented By: Una L. Lauricia
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Jaime Renee Simon
Represented By: John Richard Keville
Represented By: Michael P. Padden
Represented By: Una L. Lauricia
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Dirt Horticultural Products LLC
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Dirt LLC
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCD Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Mozwecz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?