Jager Pro LLC v. Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc
Plaintiff: Jager Pro LLC
Defendant: Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00107
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc, filed by Jager Pro LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Younger, Robert)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/13/2019. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 4/1/2019. (slb)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #13 & #14 , are granted. Darjush Boushehri and Richard W. Miller are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/27/2019. (slb)
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Richard W. Miller. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3429334. Filed by Jager Pro LLC (Younger, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Darjush Boushehri. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3429311. Filed by Jager Pro LLC (Younger, Robert)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc.(Grayson, Keith)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #9 & #10 , are granted. Robert W. Morris and Ojeiku C. Aisiku are admitted pro hac vice. The fees were paid twice. The Court directs the Clerk to refund the pro hac vice fees paid by local counsel, Mr. Grayson, on 7 March 2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/7/2019. (slb)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Ojeiku C. Aisiku. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3417626. Filed by Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc (Grayson, Keith)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert W Morris. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3417609. Filed by Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc (Grayson, Keith)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant has up to and including 4/1/2019 to file the responsive pleading. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/6/2019. (jak)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith L. Grayson on behalf of Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc (Grayson, Keith)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #4 - #5 , denied without prejudice. The Court prefers designation of an attorney who maintains an office in Arkansas. Local Rule 83.5(d), para. 2. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/4/2019. (slb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ojeiku Christopher Aisiku. Fee $100.00 Receipt Number LIT071063. Filed by Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc (jap)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert William Morris. Fee $100.00 Receipt Number LIT71062. Filed by Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc (jap)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jager Pro LLC. Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc served on 2/16/2019. (Younger, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court. (thd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc filed by Jager Pro LLC (Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT070791.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jager Pro LLC v. Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bull Creek Welding and Fabrication Inc
Represented By: Keith L. Grayson
Represented By: Ojeiku Christopher Aisiku
Represented By: Robert William Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jager Pro LLC
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Darjush Boushehri
Represented By: Richard W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?