Jager Pro LLC v. Tusk Innovations Inc
Plaintiff: Jager Pro LLC
Defendant: Tusk Innovations Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00108
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tusk Innovations Inc, filed by Jager Pro LLC(Younger, Robert)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 Jager Pro, LLC's ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim with Counterclaim Against Tusk Innovations, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Jager Pro LLC by Jager Pro LLC.(Younger, Robert)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 and #7 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Darjush Boushehri and Richard Miller are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/27/2019. (ljb)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Richard W. Miller. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3429416. Filed by Jager Pro LLC (Younger, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Darjush Boushehri. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3429403. Filed by Jager Pro LLC (Younger, Robert)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 Tusk Innovations, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Jager Pro LLC by Tusk Innovations Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Curry, Stephen)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen L. Curry on behalf of Tusk Innovations Inc (Curry, Stephen)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jager Pro LLC. Tusk Innovations Inc served on 2/23/2019. (Younger, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court. (thd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT And Jury Demand against Tusk Innovations Inc filed by Jager Pro LLC. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT070792.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jager Pro LLC v. Tusk Innovations Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tusk Innovations Inc
Represented By: Stephen L. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jager Pro LLC
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Darjush Boushehri
Represented By: Richard W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?