Levingston v. Walmart Inc

Plaintiff: Victor Levingston
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00142
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/30/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/13/2019. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 4/13/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr.Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Neemah Aaron Esmaeilpour terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/18/19. (dpb)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Walmart Inc (Esmaeilpour, Neemah)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Marie Kaemmerling on behalf of Walmart Inc (Kaemmerling, Michelle)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Walmart Inc. (ljb)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Walmart Inc filed by Victor Levingston. (ljb)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-19-303. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT070955. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levingston v. Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Levingston
Represented By: James M. Scurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: Neemah Aaron Esmaeilpour
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?