McCampbell v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: Naomi Lee McCampbell
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00169
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #11 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #11 order entered on this day, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/25/2019. (kdr)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff Naomi Lee McCampbell's motion to dismiss and vacating #3 the order granting temporary injunction. This voluntary dismissal does not operate as an adjudication on the merits because McCampbell's prior lawsuit containing the same allegations as this lawsuit was not voluntarily dismissed by the plaintiff. Thus, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/25/2019. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/20/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/3/2019. Bench Trial set for 4/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/21/19. (lp)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Response. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "REPLY to #7 Response to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Naomi Lee McCampbell" as marked on the document. (jak)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to #7 Response to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Naomi Lee McCampbell. (Raney, Donald) (Docket text modified on 3/19/2019 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Horton, Johnathan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order, #2 Exhibit B - Prior Complaint)(Horton, Johnathan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (Horton, Johnathan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OLS Naomi McCampbell Note Ex A to Answer (Redacted))(Horton, Johnathan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Naomi Lee McCampbell (Raney, Donald)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER entered by White County Circuit Judge Craig Hannah on 1/14/2019. (thd) (VACATED, pursuant to #11 Order)(Modified on 3/26/2019 )(kdr).
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Naomi Lee McCampbell.(kdr)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC from White County Circuit Court, case number 73CV-19-27. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT071132. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCampbell v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Lee McCampbell
Represented By: Donald P. Raney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Johnathan D. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Johnathan D. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?