Price et al v. Holladay et al

Plaintiff: Mozella Price, Trannetta Lemay, Treylon Lemay and Tryten Tillman
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics LLC, Linda McGraw, Pulaski County Arkansas, Karen Knudsen, Thompson, Quelinda Tillman, Ronald Routh, Toni Rose, Vanorris Sims, Matthew Briggs, Adams, Humphrey, Haley, V Clark, James Church, John Does and Charles Holladay
Case Number: 4:2019cv00200
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC.(Jackson, Benjamin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D. Jackson on behalf of Turn Key Health Clinics LLC (Jackson, Benjamin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF of Service Return and Affidavit in Support of Proof of Service on the Defendant, Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC served on 5/20/2019 filed by Mozella Price, Trannetta Lemay, Treylon Lemay, Tryten Tillman. Turn Key Health Clinics LLC. (fjg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF of Service Return, Refused, and Affidavit in Support of Proof of Service Refused on the Defendant, Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC filed by Mozella Price, Trannetta Lemay, Treylon Lemay, Tryten Tillman. (fjg)
May 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Turn Key Health Clinics LLC. Summons returned to Plaintiff's Attorney. (llg)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Diane Depper on behalf of Matthew Briggs, James Church, V Clark, Charles Holladay, Karen Knudsen, Pulaski County Arkansas, Toni Rose, Ronald Routh, Vanorris Sims (Depper, Margaret)
April 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Amended Petition for Removal. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "OBJECTION to Removal and Request for Additional Time to Supplement their Objection by All Plaintiffs" as marked on the document. (jak)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to Removal and Request for Additional Time to Supplement their Objection by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Simmons) (Docket text modified on 4/12/2019 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/31/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/14/2019. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 4/13/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Thompson Consent to Removal by Jeremy R. Thompson, M.D. (Ator, T.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #5 Notice lacks a correct case number (Local Rule 5.5(a)). (jak)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Thompson Consent to Removal by Jeremy R. Thompson, M.D. (Ator, T.)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Matthew Briggs, James Church, V Clark, Charles Holladay, Karen Knudsen, Pulaski County Arkansas, Toni Rose, Ronald Routh, Vanorris Sims. (ljb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Thompson. (ljb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Mozella Price, Trannetta Lemay, Treylon Lemay, Tryten Tillman. (ljb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthew Briggs, James Church, V Clark, Charles Holladay, Karen Knudsen, Pulaski County Arkansas, Toni Rose, Ronald Routh, Vanorris Sims from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-19-638. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT071362. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price et al v. Holladay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics LLC
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Arkansas
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Knudsen
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Represented By: T. Michelle Ator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quelinda Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Routh
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Rose
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanorris Sims
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Briggs
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Clark
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Church
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Holladay
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mozella Price
Represented By: Simmons S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trannetta Lemay
Represented By: Simmons S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treylon Lemay
Represented By: Simmons S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tryten Tillman
Represented By: Simmons S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?