Libertarian Party of Arkansas et al v. Thurston
Plaintiff: Michael Kalagias, Michael Pakko, Libertarian Party of Arkansas, Christopher Olson, Sandra Chaney Richter and Ricky Harrington, Jr
Defendant: John Thurston
Case Number: 4:2019cv00214
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 35 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #34 Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal filed by John Thurston. (Bronni, Nicholas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay re #31 Preliminary Injunction, Terminate Motions and to Shorten Response Time by John Thurston (Bronni, Nicholas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #31 Preliminary Injunction, Terminate Motions by John Thurston. (Bronni, Nicholas)
July 5, 2019 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 6/4/2019, before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Court Reporter Elaine Hinson. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 7/12/2019. Redaction Request due 7/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/5/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2019. (cmn)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER granting #12 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction and denying #21 motion to exclude the affidavit of Richard Winger. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/3/2019. (jbh)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #29 Exhibit List. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "Exhibit and Witness List" pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
June 4, 2019 Filing 30 Exhibit and Witness List by John Thurston.(tmw)
June 4, 2019 Filing 29 Exhibit and Witness List by Plaintiffs.(tmw)(Docket text modified on 6/5/2019 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
June 4, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Kristine G. Baker: MOTION HEARING held on 6/4/2019 re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Libertarian Party of Arkansas, Michael Kalagias, Michael Pakko, Christopher Olson, Ricky Harrington, Jr, and Sandra Chaney Richter. After witness testimony and arguments from counsel, the Court took the matter under advisement. A written order will be entered. (Present for plaintiffs: James Linger and William Hyman; Present for defendant: Nicholas Bronni, Dylan Jacobs, Vincent Wagner, Jennifer Merritt and Christine Cryer) (Court Reporter Elaine Hinson) (tmw)
June 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine A. Cryer on behalf of John Thurston (Cryer, Christine)
June 4, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Merritt on behalf of John Thurston (Merritt, Jennifer)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER authorizing Defendant John Thurston's counsel, Nicholas Bronni, Vincent Wagner, Dylan Jacobs, Christine Cryer, Jennifer Merritt, and Asher Steinberg, and Mr. Thurston's witnesses, M.V. Hood III, Meghan Cox, Peyton Murphy, Daniel Shults, and Jerry Cox to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the courthouse in Little Rock, Arkansas, on Tuesday, 6/4/2019, for a preliminary injunction hearing and continuing each day thereafter until the hearing concludes, subject to the rules in this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/3/2019. (jbh)
May 31, 2019 Filing 24 Exhibit List Rebuttal Exhibit List by John Thurston.(Bronni, Nicholas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Exclude Affidavit of Richard Winger filed by All Plaintiffs. (Linger, James)
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION Joint Stipulations of Fact by Ricky Harrington, Jr, Michael Kalagias, Libertarian Party of Arkansas, Christopher Olson, Michael Pakko, Sandra Chaney Richter. (Linger, James)
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Exclude Affidavit of Richard Winger by John Thurston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bronni, Nicholas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 Witness List by John Thurston(Bronni, Nicholas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 Exhibit List and Witness List by Ricky Harrington, Jr, Michael Kalagias, Libertarian Party of Arkansas, Christopher Olson, Michael Pakko, Sandra Chaney Richter.(Linger, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Moore Wagner on behalf of John Thurston (Wagner, Vincent)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peyton Murphy, #2 Declaration of M.V. Hood III)(Bronni, Nicholas)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: The Court will hold a hearing on #12 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on Tuesday, 6/4/2019 beginning at 9:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/10/2019. (cmn)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 unopposed motion for extension of time. Mr. Thurston has up to and including 5/24/2019, to file a response to the pending motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/7/2019. (cmn)
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Thurston (Jacobs, Dylan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #1 Complaint, #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Linger, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Michael Pakko)(Linger, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/1/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/15/2019; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 5/11/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 04/30/2019. (tmw)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by John Thurston.(Bronni, Nicholas)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan L. Jacobs on behalf of John Thurston (Jacobs, Dylan)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Jacob Bronni on behalf of John Thurston (Bronni, Nicholas)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 amended motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for attorney James C. Linger; and denying as moot #2 plaintiffs' earlier motion for admission pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/5/2019. (cmn)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James C. Linger. Fee $100 receipt number LIT071449. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Linger, James)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original civil cover sheet was submitted in error (wrong image file). The correct civil cover sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker. (jak)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the direction of the Court on 3/28/2019. (cmn)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James C. Linger. Fee $100 receipt number LIT071449. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (cmn)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ricky Harrington, Jr, Sandra Chaney Richter, Christopher Olson, Libertarian Party of Arkansas, Michael Pakko, and Michael Kalagias against John Thurston. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT071449. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet Correct - Submitted 4/3/2019) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Libertarian Party of Arkansas et al v. Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kalagias
Represented By: William Whitfield Hyman
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pakko
Represented By: William Whitfield Hyman
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libertarian Party of Arkansas
Represented By: William Whitfield Hyman
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Olson
Represented By: William Whitfield Hyman
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Chaney Richter
Represented By: William Whitfield Hyman
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Harrington, Jr
Represented By: William Whitfield Hyman
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?