Jones v. Jegley et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Jones
Defendant: Tony Juneau, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Alice L Eastwood, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger
Case Number: 4:2019cv00234
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 32 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Alice L Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger. (McFadden, Daniel)
July 5, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Peggy Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pekron, Chad)
July 1, 2019 Filing 39 USCA Appeal Fees received $505 receipt number LIT072827 re #27 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger, Larry Jegley, Alice L Eastwood, Tony Juneau, Sybal Jordan Hampton. (cmn)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER of USCA as to #27 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger, Larry Jegley, Alice L Eastwood, Tony Juneau, Sybal Jordan Hampton: Appellant is directed to show cause, within 14 days of the date of this order, why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (cmn) (Docket text modified on 7/1/2019 to correct typographical error.)(cmn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 37 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #36 Motion for Reconsideration (Amended Motion for Reconsideration) filed by Peggy Jones. (Pekron, Chad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 36 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 32 Order on Motion to Stay by Peggy Jones (Pekron, Chad)
June 19, 2019 Filing 35 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #34 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Stay filed by Peggy Jones. (Pekron, Chad)
June 19, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Reconsideration re 32 Order on Motion to Stay by Peggy Jones (Pekron, Chad)
June 19, 2019 Filing 33 USCA Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule as to #27 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger, Larry Jegley, Alice L Eastwood, Tony Juneau, Sybal Jordan Hampton. USCA Case Number 19-2260. (cmn)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #29 Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction pending appeal. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/19/2019. (sjh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION to Stay re #25 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Peggy Jones. (Pekron, Chad)
June 18, 2019 Filing 30 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #29 Motion to Stay filed by All Defendants. (Bird, William)
June 18, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay re #25 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Defendants (Bird, William)
June 17, 2019 Filing 28 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #27 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal re #25 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL: REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPTS SHOULD BE FILED WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERK. (cmn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #25 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alice L Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger. (Bird, William)
June 17, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Bird, III on behalf of All Defendants (Bird, William)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Defendants are enjoined from enforcing Ark. Code Ann. 7-6-203(e) during the pendency of this matter. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/17/2019. (jbh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Peggy Jones. (Pekron, Chad)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on Wednesday, 6/12/2019 re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Peggy Jones. Chad Pekron, Brittany Ford, Christoph Keller present for plaintiff; Daniel McFadden present for defendants. Following argument by counsel, Court addresses parties. Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Christa Jacimore) (cdw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Peggy Jones. (Pekron, Chad)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Rely. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/10/2019. (sjh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Preliminary Injunction Instanter by Peggy Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Pekron, Chad)
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alice L Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger. (McFadden, Daniel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #13 : MOTION HEARING reset for 6/12/2019 at 1:30 PM in Little Rock Courtroom #4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr.(kog)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #13 : MOTION HEARING set for 6/19/2019 at 2:00 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. (kog)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to 15 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court. (thd)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER OF RECUSAL: I recuse from this case and direct the Clerk of the Court to randomly reassign this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/24/19. (mmb)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Peggy Jones. (Pekron, Chad)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Peggy Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pekron, Chad)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alice L Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger.(McFadden, Daniel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Lori Klein served on 4/25/2019. (Pekron, Chad)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Alice L Eastwood served on 4/25/2019. (Pekron, Chad)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Ashley Driver Younger served on 4/25/2019. (Pekron, Chad)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Tony Juneau served on 4/25/2019. (Pekron, Chad)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Sybal Jordan Hampton served on 4/25/2019. (Pekron, Chad)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/9/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/23/2019. Bench Trial set for 5/5/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 5/1/19. (mmb)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendants' answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Monday, May 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/01/19. (dmm)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Larry Jegley (McFadden, Daniel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of Larry Jegley (McFadden, Daniel)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Larry Jegley served on 4/11/2019. (Pekron, Chad)
April 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to Alice L Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Peggy Jones. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT071591.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Jegley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Juneau
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sybal Jordan Hampton
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jegley
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice L Eastwood
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Klein
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Driver Younger
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Jones
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Brittany S. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?