Hampton v. Love Beal & Nixon PC et al
Plaintiff: Tyshun Hampton
Defendant: Love Beal & Nixon PC, Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Management Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00235
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/26/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/9/2019. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 6/8/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr.Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Midland Credit Management Inc, Midland Funding LLC.(Shannon, Michael)
May 12, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Love, Beal & Nixon, PC by Tyshun Hampton. (McGaha, Corey)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Midland Credit Management Inc answer due 5/17/2019; Midland Funding LLC answer due 5/17/2019. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/8/2019. (sjh)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Norris Shannon on behalf of Midland Credit Management Inc, Midland Funding LLC (Shannon, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Midland Credit Management Inc, Midland Funding LLC (Shannon, Michael)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Tyshun Hampton. Love Beal & Nixon PC served on 4/16/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Tyshun Hampton. Midland Credit Management Inc served on 4/12/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Tyshun Hampton. Midland Funding LLC served on 4/12/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Tyshun Hampton. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT071600.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Love Beal & Nixon PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyshun Hampton
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love Beal & Nixon PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?