Bank of the West v. Accurate Boring Company et al

Plaintiff: Bank of the West
Defendant: Malvern National Bank, Accurate Boring Company and David H Thornton
Case Number: 4:2019cv00252
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/16/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/30/2019. Proposed Bench Trial set sometime during the week of 6/29/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Accurate Boring Company, David H Thornton.(Duke, William)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Bank of the West Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Of Malvern National Bank (Fortson, Grant)
April 23, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 Objections. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to 4 Order. (jak)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTIONS by Accurate Boring Company, David H Thornton re 4 Order. (Duke, William) (Docket text modified on 4/23/2019 to correct the linkage) (jak)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Accurate Boring Company, David H Thornton (Duke, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Duke on behalf of Accurate Boring Company, David H Thornton (Duke, William)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice, Consent, Refereance of Civil Action to Magistrate Judge; Ex Parte Motion for Order Directing Clerk to Issue Notice Pursuant to A.C.A. 18-60-808, Order granting Motion, Notice, Corporate Disclosure Statement , filed by Bank of the West. Accurate Boring Company served on 4/17/2019. (Fortson, Grant)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice, Consent, Refereance of Civil Action to Magistrate Judge; Ex Parte Motion for Order Directing Clerk to Issue Notice Pursuant to A.C.A. 18-60-808, Order granting Motion, Notice, Corporate Disclosure Statement , filed by Bank of the West. David H Thornton served on 4/17/2019. (Fortson, Grant)
April 16, 2019 NOTICE Issued as to Accurate Boring Company and returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (jap)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Bank of the West (Fortson, Grant)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Order. The Clerk is directed to issue notice pursuant to Ark. Code Ann. 18-60-808. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/15/19. (dpb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion for Order Brief In Support Of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion For Order Directing Clerk To Issue Notice Pursuant to Ark. Code Ann. 18-60-808 filed by Bank of the West. (Fortson, Grant)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion For Order Directing Clerk To Issue Notice Pursuant To Ark. Code Ann. 18-60-808 by Bank of the West (Fortson, Grant)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN AND FOR MONEY DAMAGES against All Defendants filed by Bank of the West. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT071714.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of the West v. Accurate Boring Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malvern National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accurate Boring Company
Represented By: William David Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Thornton
Represented By: William David Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of the West
Represented By: Grant E. Fortson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?