Carson v. Lacy et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Carson
Defendant: Roger Lacy, Laidlaw & Lacy Inc, Corporation Services Co and First Advantage Background Services Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00256
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing the clerk to rename defendant "Corporation Services Co." to First Advantage Background Services Corporation" on the docket sheet; and granting #8 First Advantage Background Services Corporation's motion to dismiss, and dismissing it from this lawsuit. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/8/2019. (kdr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Roger Lacy c/o Anita Cotton, Manager, served on 6/19/2019. (llg)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Corporation Services Co. (Spak, Jason)
May 24, 2019 Summons Reissued as to Roger Lacy. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #12 motion for service. The clerk is directed to prepare the summons, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and the summons on the defendant at the address provided by the plaintiff in his motion. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 05/24/2019. (sj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Defendant's #8 MOTION TO DISMISS with Brief filed by Arthur Carson. (fjg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF Request for Alternative Service on an Evasive Defendant by Arthur Carson (jap)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 5/17/2019 as to Laidlaw & Lacy Inc. (fjg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Corporation Services Co (Spak, Jason)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Corporation Services Co. (Spak, Jason)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Corporation Services Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Spak, Jason)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Andrew Spak on behalf of Corporation Services Co (Spak, Jason)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 5/8/2019 as to Roger Lacy. (fjg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Corporation Services Co served on 5/2/2019. (fjg)
April 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff Arthur Carson's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Carson shall be assessed an initial partial filing fee of $20 and must pay $10 every month until the entire $350 filing fee is satisfied. The clerk is directed to prepare the summons, and the United States Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and summons on the defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/16/2019. (cmn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the direction of the Court on 4/15/2019. (kdr)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Arthur Carson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arthur Carson. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson v. Lacy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laidlaw & Lacy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation Services Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Advantage Background Services Corporation
Represented By: Jason Andrew Spak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?