Johnson v. Jacob et al
Plaintiff: Betty Johnson
Defendant: Jacob Law Group PLLC, Michael A Jacob, II, Midland Credit Management Inc and Midland Funding LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00267
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Betty Johnson. Michael A Jacob, II served on 4/19/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint - Class Action , filed by Betty Johnson. Midland Credit Management Inc served on 4/23/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
May 8, 2019 Cases associated. Create association to 4:19-cv-00179-JM per #9 Order. (ljb)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 motion to consolidate. The Clerk is directed to reassign Welch v. Jacob, et al, 5:19-cv-105-BRW, and Brownlee v. Jacob, et al, 4:19-cv-208-BSM, to this Court. The cases will be consolidated with Campbell v. Jacob, et al., 4:19-cv-179 as the lead case. All filings should be made in the lead case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/8/2019. (ljb)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion for Order filed by Betty Johnson. (McGaha, Corey)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Order Assigning Case as Related by Betty Johnson (McGaha, Corey)
April 28, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint - Class Action , filed by Betty Johnson. Jacob Law Group PLLC served on 4/23/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
April 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint - Class Action , filed by Betty Johnson. Midland Funding LLC served on 4/23/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 and #3 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Cathleen M. Combs and Daniel A. Edelman are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/24/2019. (ljb)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel A Edelman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3447926. Filed by Betty Johnson (McGaha, Corey)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Cathleen M Combs. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3447918. Filed by Betty Johnson (McGaha, Corey)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Betty Johnson. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT071749.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Jacob et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Law Group PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Jacob, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Johnson
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?