Rowlett v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc
Plaintiff: Amanda Rowlett
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00298
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Discovery due by 2/5/2020. Daubert and Dispositive Motions due by 2/20/2020. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 4/7/2020.Entered at the direction of the Court on 5/29/19. (mmb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. (Joint Rule 26(f) Report) (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.(Pearson, Allison)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/30/19. (mmb)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3451717. Filed by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc (Pearson, Allison)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/3/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/17/2019. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson.Entered at the direction of the Court on 4/26/19. (mmb)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc filed by Amanda Rowlett. (ljb)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-18-8097. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT071859. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowlett v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Rowlett
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane LaRue-Grigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?