Vance v. Grimes et al
Plaintiff: Preston V Vance, Jr
Defendant: Brandon Grimes, Betis and Long
Case Number: 4:2019cv00325
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Joe J Volpe
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Brandon Grimes, Long and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff be allowed to proceed with his failure to protect claim against Defendants Grimes and Long in their individual capacities only. Plaintiff's official capacity claims be dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Betis be dismissed without prejudice as a party to this lawsuit. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/26/2019. (lej)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Clerk prepare summons and the USM serve Defendants Grimes and Long without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/26/2019. (lej)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Preston V Vance, Jr.(kdr)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP Application #6 . Service is not appropriate at this time. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/23/2019. (lej)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Preston V Vance, Jr. (kdr)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel #4 . A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered Plaintiff's need for an attorney, the likelihood that Plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual complexity of the case, the Plaintiff's ability to investigate and present his case, and the complexity of the legal issues. In considering these factors, the Court finds that Plaintiff's claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and it appears he is capable of prosecuting his claims without appointed counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/13/2019. (lej)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Preston V Vance, Jr. (kdr)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either: (a) pay the full filing fee; or (b) file a properly complete Application and Calculation Sheet. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/8/2019. (lej)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Preston V Vance, Jr. (ljb)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Preston V Vance, Jr. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vance v. Grimes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston V Vance, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?