Abdul-Bey v. Parker

Appellant: Kwami Abdul-Bey
Appellee: Maytrine L Parker
Case Number: 4:2019cv00330
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #5 order entered today, this case is remanded. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/17/2019. (ljb)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing Kwami Abdul-Bey's appeal; and dismissing and remanding this case to bankruptcy court for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/17/2019. (ljb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this case to Judge Brian Miller as it is related to 4:19-cv-101-BSM. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/9/2019. (ljb)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 SCHEDULING NOTICE (BANKRUPTCY APPEALS). Appellant's Brief due by 6/5/2019. Appellee's brief is due 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/7/2019.(cmn)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Kwami Abdul-Bey. Bankruptcy Court case number 4:18-ap-01101. (Attachments: #1 BK DE#1, Complaint, #2 BK DE#5, Motion for Default Judgment, #3 BK DE#20, Order, #4 DK#22, Motion for Leave to Appeal, #5 BK Docket Sheet, #6 Transmittal Letter)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdul-Bey v. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kwami Abdul-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Maytrine L Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?