Ford v. Ozark Capital Corporation

Plaintiff: Annette Jackson Ford
Defendant: Ozark Capital Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00334
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:521
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed without prejudice 7 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/25/2019. (kdr)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #5 , granted. The complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/25/2019. (slb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ozark Capital Corporation.(Henry, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation of Dismissal by Annette Jackson Ford (Burks, Christopher)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #3 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 19 June 2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/29/2019. (slb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ozark Capital Corporation (Henry, Robert)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Henry, III on behalf of Ozark Capital Corporation (Henry, Robert)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ozark Capital Corporation, filed by Annette Jackson Ford. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072086. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Ozark Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Jackson Ford
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Capital Corporation
Represented By: Robert L. Henry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?