Pugh v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tiffany Pugh
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00342
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Knisley, Kathryn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Bess Knisley on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Knisley, Kathryn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Huckabay, D.)
May 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint and #4 Jury Demand. CORRECTION: The docket text for docket entry #2 Complaint was modified to remove the reference to the Jury Demand. Docket entry #4 Jury Demand was modified to correct the party filer as defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (thd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/12/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/26/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 05/14/2019. (tmw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (cmn) (Docket entry modified on 5/15/2019 to correct the party filer.) (thd).
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(cmn)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Tiffany Pugh against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(cmn) (Docket text modified on 5/15/2019 to remove the reference to the Jury Demand.) (thd).
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-2539. Fee $400 receipt number LIT072150. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pugh v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Pugh
Represented By: Kenneth Jerald Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?