Woolfolk v. Gibbins et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Lee Woolfolk
Defendant: Michael Gibbins and North Little Rock Police Department
Case Number: 4:2019cv00353
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. Response due by 8/12/2019. (jbh)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order by Ronnie Lee Woolfolk. (jbh)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 motion in limine because this case is stayed until the state court criminal charges against Ronnie Lee Woolfolk have been resolved. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/7/2019. (ljb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION in Limine by Ronnie Lee Woolfolk. (ljb)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Woolfolk's motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing Woolfolk's custodian to withdraw monthly payments in the amount of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to his account each time the account exceeds $10 until the statutory fee has been paid in full; notifying Woolfolk of the Rule 5.5(c)(2) of the Rules of the United States District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas; directing the clerk to stay and administratively terminate this proceeding pending final disposition of Woolfolk's state criminal charges; Woolfolk may move to reopen this case after final disposition of his criminal charges; and directing the clerk to send a copy of this order to the Administrator for the Pulaski County Detention Center. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/17/2019. (kdr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Ronnie Lee Woolfolk. (ljb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie Lee Woolfolk. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woolfolk v. Gibbins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gibbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Little Rock Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Lee Woolfolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?