Tiner v. Hunter
Plaintiff: Mildred Tiner
Defendant: Rhonda Hunt
Case Number: 4:2019cv00359
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/20/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/3/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/22/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 06/21/2019. (tmw)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Mildred Tiner. Rhonda Hunt served on 5/13/2019. (Sexton, Clayton)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rhonda Hunt.(cmn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION by Rhonda Hunt. (cmn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mildred Tiner against Rhonda Hunt. (cmn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rhonda Hunt from Saline County Circuit Court, case number 63CV-2019-494-3. Fee $400 receipt number LIT072212. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiner v. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Hunt
Represented By: Jason James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Tiner
Represented By: Travis R. Berry
Represented By: Clayton Blair Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?