Little Rock Downtown Neighborhood Association Inc et al v. Federal Highway Administration et al
Plaintiff: Denise Ennett, Pettaway Neighborhood Association, Barbara Barrows, Rohn Muse, Coalition of Little Rock Neighborhoods Inc, Joshua Silverstein, John Hedrick, Hanger Hill Neighborhood Association, Dale Pekar, Arkansas Communities Organization Inc, Little Rock Downtown Neighborhood Association Inc, Kathy Wells and Forest Hills Neighborhood Association Inc
Defendant: Department of Transportation, Arkansas Department of Transportation, Federal Highway Administration, Arkansas Division, Federal Highway Administration and Scott Bennett
Case Number: 4:2019cv00362
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/12/19. (dpb)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER withdrawing #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction pursuant to joint motion. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/12/19. (dpb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #8 Brief in Support,, by All Defendants (Chellis, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Project Map, #2 Exhibit EA, #3 Exhibit FONSI, #4 Exhibit Notices, #5 Exhibit Letter, #6 Exhibit Public Notices, #7 Exhibit Letter, #8 Exhibit Letter, #9 Exhibit Letter, #10 Exhibit Letter, #11 Exhibit Article, #12 Exhibit Publication, #13 Exhibit Article, #14 Exhibit Permit, #15 Exhibit Letter, #16 Exhibit Minutes, #17 Exhibit Article, #18 Exhibit Notice, #19 Exhibit Public Notice, #20 Exhibit Article, #21 Exhibit Email)(Mays, Richard)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs (Mays, Richard) (WITHDRAWN pursuant to 10 Order.) Modified on 7/12/2019 (ljb).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time. ArDOT and Mr. Bennett are given an enlargement of time to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint until the same responsive deadline for the Federal Defendants, currently equal to sixty (60) days from the date of service of the Complaint on the Federal Defendants. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/4/19. (dpb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time by Arkansas Department of Transportation, Scott Bennett (Looney, Rita)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rita S. Looney on behalf of Arkansas Department of Transportation, Scott Bennett (Looney, Rita)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Umeda on behalf of Arkansas Department of Transportation, Scott Bennett (Umeda, Mark)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Chellis on behalf of Department of Transportation, Federal Highway Administration, Federal Highway Administration, Arkansas Division (Chellis, Christopher)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072224.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Rock Downtown Neighborhood Association Inc et al v. Federal Highway Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Ennett
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pettaway Neighborhood Association
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Barrows
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rohn Muse
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition of Little Rock Neighborhoods Inc
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Silverstein
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hedrick
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanger Hill Neighborhood Association
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Pekar
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Communities Organization Inc
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Rock Downtown Neighborhood Association Inc
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Wells
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Hills Neighborhood Association Inc
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation
Represented By: Christopher M. Chellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Transportation
Represented By: Christopher M. Chellis
Represented By: Mark Umeda
Represented By: Rita S. Looney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration, Arkansas Division
Represented By: Christopher M. Chellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Represented By: Christopher M. Chellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bennett
Represented By: Christopher M. Chellis
Represented By: Mark Umeda
Represented By: Rita S. Looney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?