Ventura v. Schickel's Cleaners Inc et al
Plaintiff: Maria D Ventura
Defendant: Ron Zimmerman, Does 1-10; #11 Payton, last name unknown., Tom Dober and Schickel's Cleaners Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00377
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Tom Dober, Schickel's Cleaners Inc, Ron Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination)(Donovan, David)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or file a responsive pleading. Tom Dober answer due 7/18/2019; Does answer due 7/18/2019; Schickel's Cleaners Inc answer due 7/18/2019; Ron Zimmerman answer due 7/18/2019.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/9/19. (amr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Tom Dober, Schickel's Cleaners Inc, Ron Zimmerman (Donovan, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Donovan on behalf of Tom Dober, Schickel's Cleaners Inc, Ron Zimmerman (Donovan, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria D Ventura. Tom Dober served on 6/17/2019. (Burgos, Alex)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria D Ventura. Ron Zimmerman served on 6/17/2019. (Burgos, Alex)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria D Ventura. Schickel's Cleaners Inc served on 6/17/2019. (Burgos, Alex)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Maria D Ventura. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072355.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ventura v. Schickel's Cleaners Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Zimmerman
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10; #11 Payton, last name unknown.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dober
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schickel's Cleaners Inc
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D Ventura
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Alex R. Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?