McEwen v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Janet S McEwen
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00383
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/29/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Motions to amend and join other Parties due by 11/1/2019; Discovery due by 1/31/2020; Motions due by 1/31/2020; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/29/2020. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/15/2019. (hml)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Huckabay, D.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Bess Knisley on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Knisley, Kathryn)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Huckabay, D.)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Initial Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the location of the trial as Little Rock Courtroom A530 as marked on the Order. (jak)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/12/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/26/2019; and Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/4/2019. (hml) (Docket text modified on 6/5/2019 to correct the location of the trial) (jak)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (jbh)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (jbh)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed by Janet S McEwen. (jbh)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Yell County Circuit Court, case number 75SCV-19-26-2. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt number LIT072406. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McEwen v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet S McEwen
Represented By: Lauren Alexander Manatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?