Flowers v. American National Property and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Ernnie Flowers
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00385
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Motions to amend and join other parties due by 10/15/2019; Discovery due by 1/15/2020; Motions due by 2/14/2020; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/25/2019. (hml)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ernnie Flowers. (Chaney, Donald)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Answer to Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include a reference to the Jury Demand. (thd)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Initial Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the signature of the Order as "Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/4/2019". (jak)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/12/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/26/2019; and Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/4/2019. (hml) (Docket text modified on 6/5/2019 to correct the signature of the Order) (jak)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by American National Property and Casualty Company. (jbh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by American National Property and Casualty Company.(jbh) (Docket text modified on 6/5/2019 to include a reference to the Jury Demand.)(thd).
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American National Property and Casualty Company, filed by Ernnie Flowers. (jbh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American National Property and Casualty Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-00606. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt # LIT072441. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. American National Property and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Mark Steven Breeding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernnie Flowers
Represented By: Sterling Taylor Chaney
Represented By: Donald P. Chaney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?