Moore v. Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield
Plaintiff: Corinne Moore
Defendant: Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield
Case Number: 4:2019cv00397
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #1 Moore's motion to proceed in forma pauperis; assessing Moore an initial partial filing fee of $20, and she must pay $10 every subsequent month until the entire $400 filing fee is satisfied; directing the clerk's office to issue summons; and directing the USMS to serve the amended complaint, along with any attachments, and a summons for Blue Cross Blue Shield without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/31/2019. (kdr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 ADDENDUM filed by Corinne Moore to #6 Amended Complaint. (jap)
July 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 7/17/2019 as marked on the document. (jak)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shieldfiled by Corinne Moore.(fjg) (Docket entry modified on 7/18/2019 to correct the file date)(jak)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 motion to appoint counsel and directing Corinne Moore to amend her #2 complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/17/2019. (jbh)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/10/2019. (kdr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Corinne Moore. (kdr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield, filed by Corinne Moore.(kdr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Corinne Moore. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinne Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?