Davis v. Starks et al
Plaintiff: Kim Blackshire-Lee and Britney Davis
Defendant: Little Rock, City of, Charles Starks and Michael Simpson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00398
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Charles Starks.(Newcomb, Robert)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Substitute Party. Accordingly, Britney Davis, in her capacity as Special Administratrix of the Estate of Bradley Blackshire, is substituted for Kim Blackshire-Lee as Plaintiff in this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 07/29/19. (dmm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Billy Roy Wilson:Telephone Conference held on 7/29/2019 to discuss possible conflict of interest. Arguments made. Court is in recess. Pl: David Owens and Omavi Shukur; Dft: Robert Newcomb, Alex Betton and Tom Carpenter. (Court Reporter Christa Jacimore.) (mmb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing-TELEPHONE CONFERENCE on Motion #14 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute set for 7/29/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (mmb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party (Britney Walls) by Kim Blackshire-Lee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kushukuru, Omavi)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 , #11 and #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Arthur Loevy, Jon Loevy and David B. Owens are admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/19/19. (mmb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by David B. Owens. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3501382. Filed by Kim Blackshire-Lee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David B. Owens)(Kushukuru, Omavi)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jon Loevy. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3501376. Filed by Kim Blackshire-Lee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jon Loevy)(Kushukuru, Omavi)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Arthur Loevy. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3501371. Filed by Kim Blackshire-Lee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Arthur Loevy)(Kushukuru, Omavi)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Betton on behalf of Little Rock, City of, Michael Simpson (Betton, Alexander)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Carpenter on behalf of Little Rock, City of, Michael Simpson (Carpenter, Thomas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Charles Starks by Kim Blackshire-Lee. (Kushukuru, Omavi)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Michael Simpson by Kim Blackshire-Lee. (Kushukuru, Omavi)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Little Rock, City of by Kim Blackshire-Lee. (Kushukuru, Omavi)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/12/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/26/2019. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 7/8/19. (mmb)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Newcomb on behalf of Charles Starks (Newcomb, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jbh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kim Blackshire-Lee. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072547.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #2 Main Document - Correction (submitted 6/17/2019) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Starks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock, City of
Represented By: Alexander J. Betton
Represented By: Thomas M. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Starks
Represented By: Robert A. Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Simpson
Represented By: Alexander J. Betton
Represented By: Thomas M. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Blackshire-Lee
Represented By: Omavi Shukur Kushukuru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britney Davis
Represented By: David B. Owens
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Omavi Shukur
Represented By: Arthur Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?