Walker v. Care Above All Care Inc et al
Plaintiff: Margo Walker
Defendant: Leanna Godley and Care Above All Care Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00413
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint -Collective Action by Care Above All Care Inc, Leanna Godley.(Kim, Jane)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daveante Jones on behalf of Care Above All Care Inc, Leanna Godley (Jones, Daveante)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/10/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/24/2019. Bench Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 7/8/19. (mmb)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendants' answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Friday, July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 07/03/19. (dmm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Extend Time Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Care Above All Care Inc, Leanna Godley (Jones, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margo Walker. Care Above All Care Inc served on 6/24/2019; Leanna Godley served on 6/24/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants filed by Margo Walker. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072591.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Care Above All Care Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanna Godley
Represented By: Jane A. Kim
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: David L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Above All Care Inc
Represented By: Jane A. Kim
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: David L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margo Walker
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?