Twin Med LLC v. Skyline Healthcare LLC et al
Plaintiff: Twin Med LLC
Defendant: Jonesboro Holdings LLC, Mine Creek Holdings LLC, Heritage of Hot Springs Holdings LLC, Highlands of Fort Smith Holdings LLC, Linrock Health Care and Rehabilitation Center LLC, Stonegate Villa Health and Rehabilitation LLC, Searcy Holdings LLC, Lindley HealthCare and Rehabilitation Center LLC, Dierks Healthcare & Rehabilitation Center LLC, Highlands of Stamps Holdings LLC, Batesville Holdings LLC, Highlands of Stamps LLC, The Waters of North Little Rock LLC, Highlands of Little Rock West Markham LLC, Laurel Brook Healthcare & Rehabilitation Center LLC, Joseph Schwartz, White Hall Holdings LLC, Highlands of Mountain View SNF Holdings LLC, Highlands of Little Rock South Cumberland Holdings LLC, Skyline Healthcare LLC, Pro Procurement Services LLC, Glenwood Health & Rehabilitation LLC, Madison Health & Rehab LLC, Spring Place Healthcare & Rehabilitation Center LLC, Highlands of Rogers Dixieland Holdings LLC, Broadway Health Holdings LLC, Magnolia Health Holdings LLC, Creekside Health Holdings LLC, Crown Point HealthCare & Rehabilitation Center LLC, Lonoke Healthcare Center and Rehabilitation Facility LLC and Waters of North Little Rock LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00415
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 unopposed motion for extension of time to plead. Defendants shall have up to and including 8/21/2019, to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/8/2019. (jbh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Plead by Twin Med LLC (Donovan, Richard)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party served as Batesville Holdings LLC as marked on the document. (jak)
July 29, 2019 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. White Hall Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Spring Place Healthcare & Rehabilitation Center LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Skyline Healthcare LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Searcy Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Pro Procurement Services LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Mine Creek Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Magnolia Health Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Madison Health & Rehab LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Lonoke Healthcare Center and Rehabilitation Facility LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Linrock Health Care and Rehabilitation Center LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Lindley HealthCare and Rehabilitation Center LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Laurel Brook Healthcare & Rehabilitation Center LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Jonesboro Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Joseph Schwartz served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Highlands of Stamps LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Highlands of Rogers Dixieland Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Highlands of Mountain View SNF Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Highlands of Little Rock West Markham LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Twin Med LLC. Highlands of Little Rock South Cumberland Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Highlands of Fort Smith Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Highlands of Stamps Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Heritage of Hot Springs Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Dierks Healthcare & Rehabilitation Center LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Creekside Health Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons , filed by Twin Med LLC. Crown Point HealthCare & Rehabilitation Center LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Twin Med LLC. Broadway Health Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service Batesville Holdings, LLC, filed by Twin Med LLC. Batesville Holdings LLC served on 7/16/2019. (Baker, Karen) (Docket text modified on 7/31/2019 to correct the party served) (jak)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #3 notice of dismissal and dismissing without prejudice defendants Stonegate Health & Rehabilitation, LLC; Glenwood Health & Rehabilitation LLC; and Waters of North Little Rock, LLC. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/9/2019. (jbh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Madison Health & Rehab LLC.(Burnett, Ronald)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Schroeder Burnett, Jr on behalf of Madison Health & Rehab LLC (Burnett, Ronald)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Twin Med LLC Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) (Donovan, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Twin Med LLC. (jbh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Twin Med LLC. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072595.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twin Med LLC v. Skyline Healthcare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Creek Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage of Hot Springs Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highlands of Fort Smith Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linrock Health Care and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonegate Villa Health and Rehabilitation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Searcy Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindley HealthCare and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dierks Healthcare & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highlands of Stamps Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batesville Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highlands of Stamps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Waters of North Little Rock LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highlands of Little Rock West Markham LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel Brook Healthcare & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Hall Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highlands of Mountain View SNF Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highlands of Little Rock South Cumberland Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyline Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Procurement Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenwood Health & Rehabilitation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Health & Rehab LLC
Represented By: Ronald Schroeder Burnett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Place Healthcare & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highlands of Rogers Dixieland Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Health Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Health Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creekside Health Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Point HealthCare & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonoke Healthcare Center and Rehabilitation Facility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waters of North Little Rock LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin Med LLC
Represented By: Karen Baker
Represented By: Richard T. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?