Adams v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: Clayton Adams
Defendant: Jennifer Hall, John Does and Harold Hall Roofing Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00433
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/20/2019. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/2/2019. (slb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Clayton Adams. Jennifer Hall served on 7/11/2019. (Gillham, Lucien)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clayton Adams. Harold Hall Roofing Inc served on 7/11/2019., AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Clayton Adams. Harold Hall Roofing Inc served on 7/11/2019. (Gillham, Lucien)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 and #4 Answers. CORRECTION: The docket texts were modified to remove reference to the Jury demand. (jak)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefan Kane McBride on behalf of Jennifer Hall, Harold Hall Roofing Inc (McBride, Stefan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Harold Hall Roofing Inc.(Davidson, Charles)(Docket text modified on 7/16/2019 to remove reference to the Jury demand) (jak)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jennifer Hall.(Davidson, Charles) (Docket text modified on 7/16/2019 to remove reference to the Jury demand) (jak)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 JOHN DOE AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL by Clayton Adams. (kdr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Clayton Adams. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072681. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Hall
Represented By: Stefan Kane McBride
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Hall Roofing Inc
Represented By: Stefan Kane McBride
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Adams
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?