Proctor v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Patricia A Proctor
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00453
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 E-MAIL received from U.S. District Court Northern District of California, confirming the case was received and opened in their district as case number 3:19-cv-04113. (jak)
July 16, 2019 Docket Note: Pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order, this case was electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court Northern District of California on this date. (jak)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-141) in re Roundup Products Liability Litigations. Directing the case to be transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California to be consolidated with MDL No. 2741. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W Nichols on 7/11/2019.(jak)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/28/2019. (jbh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company filed by Patricia A Proctor. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072788.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Proctor
Represented By: John K. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?