Bray v. Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carlyn Bray
Defendant: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00457
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint (REPLY MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS) filed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Enerson, Wendy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/6/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/20/2019. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 8/10/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr.Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File a reply brief. Defendant may file its reply within five (5) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/19. (amr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Brief by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Crass, Kevin)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER finding as moot #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jerry Garner is not listed as an attorney of record for Plaintiff in this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/19. (amr)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by Carlyn Bray. (Steadman, Timothy)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 and #9 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant. Peter J. Valeta and Wendy N. Enerson are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/6/2019. (ljb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Wendy N. Enerson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3511352. Filed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Crass, Kevin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Peter J. Valeta. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3511338. Filed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Crass, Kevin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jerry Garner by Carlyn Bray (Holleman, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Crass, Kevin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Crass, Kevin)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to July 26, 2019. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/1/19. (amr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Extend Time to file Responsive Pleading by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Crass, Kevin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company filed by Carlyn Bray. (ljb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company from Lonoke County Circuit Court, Case Number 43CV-19-440. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072794. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bray v. Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: Peter J. Valeta
Represented By: Wendy N. Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlyn Bray
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: John Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?